Hitt v. McLane et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hitt
Defendant: Correct Care (Wellpath) Recovery Solutions, Daniel Rakes, Karen Harmon, Marsha McLane and Edward Towns
Amicus Curiae: - Amicus Curiae Office of the Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv00735
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Daniel Rakes. (dm)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Marsha McLane. (dm)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SERVICE ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
September 9, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Correct Care (Wellpath) Recovery Solutions answer due 9/20/2019. (dm)
September 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline is extended until September 20, 2019. Entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj)
September 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Defendant Correct Care, LLC d/b/a CCRS of Texas, LLC by Correct Care (Wellpath) Recovery Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Pickett, Amber)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by - Amicus Curiae Office of the Attorney General. (Fellows, Adam)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonathan Hitt. Correct Care (Wellpath) Recovery Solutions served on 8/16/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (dm)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Request for U.S. Marshals Service Expenses in PAUPER Case. (dm)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Daniel Rakes. (dm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Correct Care (Wellpath) Recovery Solutions. (dm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Karen Harmon. (dm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Edward Towns. (dm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marsha McLane. (dm)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Service. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Mark Lane. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter mailed to Jonathan Hitt. (dl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan Hitt.. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (dl)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Jonathan Hitt. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents for Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Cover Letter, #28 Envelope)(dl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #29 Civil Cover Sheet) (dl).
July 22, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (dl)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitt v. McLane et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care (Wellpath) Recovery Solutions
Represented By: Amber Rochelle Pickett
Represented By: Nichol L. Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Rakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Towns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Hitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: - Amicus Curiae Office of the Attorney General
Represented By: Adam Fellows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?