American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association v. Deary et al
Plaintiff: American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association
Defendant: Marissa Deary, Margie Meeks and Veola Palmer
Case Number: 1:2019cv00741
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Release of Funds. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Original ANSWER to Complaint of Defendant Marissa Deary. Attorney Raul Steven Pastrana added to party Marissa Deary(pty:dft) by Marissa Deary.(Pastrana, Raul)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Veola Palmer.(afd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Margie Meeks.(afd)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Release of Funds by American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Release Funds)(Kitchin, Brytne)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association. Marissa Deary served on 8/10/2019, answer due 9/2/2019. (Kitchin, Brytne)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Receive and Deposit Monies into Court's Registry. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (afd)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Interpleader Order by American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kitchin, Brytne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Marissa Deary, Margie Meeks, Veola Palmer. (afd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association. Corrected (Kitchin, Brytne)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #2 Request for Issuance of Summons (afd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association. (Padgett, Rachel)
July 23, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
July 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12384047). No Summons requested at this time, filed by American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Padgett, Rachel) (Attachment 9 replaced on 7/24/2019 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association v. Deary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Deary
Represented By: Raul Steven Pastrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margie Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veola Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Armed Forces Mutual Aid Association
Represented By: Rachel Kelly Padgett
Represented By: Brytne D. Kitchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?