Commission for Lawyer Discipline v. Stokes
Plaintiff: Commission for Lawyer Discipline
Defendant: Brandi K. Stokes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00754
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF GENEVA CONVENTION III ART. 17 COMPLIANCE by Brandi K. Stokes (Stokes, Brandi)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Filing Mandatory Reporting Requirement Affecting NATO Operations (unclassified partial report) by Brandi K. Stokes (Stokes, Brandi)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Filing: State Clerk's Record through August 1, 2019 (redaction exemption applies) by Brandi K. Stokes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 1, #2 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 2, #3 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 3, #4 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 4, #5 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 5, #6 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 6, #7 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 7, #8 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 8, #9 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 9, #10 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 10, #11 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 11, #12 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 12, #13 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 13, #14 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 14, #15 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 15, #16 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 16, #17 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 17, #18 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 18, #19 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 19, #20 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 20, #21 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 21, #22 Exhibit Clerk's Record Part 22)(Stokes, Brandi)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Commission for Lawyer Discipline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(DeBerry, Judith)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by Brandi K. Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 State Court Records on CD (Not Available Electronically))(cj)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Brandi K. Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Order to Supplement and Electronic Filing From, #2 Proposed Order)(cj)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Brandi K. Stokes. (cj)
July 26, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Objection to Magistrate Judge by Brandi K. Stokes (cj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Objection to Hearing on Submission by Brandi K. Stokes (cj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Brandi K. Stokes. (cj)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $400 receipt number 100036459), filed by Brandi K. Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt)(cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commission for Lawyer Discipline v. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commission for Lawyer Discipline
Represented By: Judith Gres DeBerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi K. Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?