Doe v. The University of Texas at Austin
Plaintiff: Jon UTAUS-SR Doe
Defendant: The University of Texas at Austin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00756
Filed: July 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jon UTAUS-SR Doe (Gorman, Terry)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by The University of Texas at Austin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Lee, Summer)
August 16, 2019 Reset Deadlines: The University of Texas at Austin answer due 9/3/2019. (dm)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before September 3, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by The University of Texas at Austin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting The University of Texas at Austin's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading)(Lee, Summer)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The University of Texas at Austin. (dl)
July 28, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jon UTAUS-SR Doe. (dl)
July 28, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
July 28, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 28, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by UTAUS-SR JON DOE. (Gorman, Terry)
July 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ORIGINAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12403095), filed by UTAUS-SR JON DOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gorman, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The University of Texas at Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon UTAUS-SR Doe
Represented By: Chigozie Frances Odediran
Represented By: Terry P. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Texas at Austin
Represented By: Summer R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?