Sayers Construction, LLC v. Accordant Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Sayers Construction, LLC
Defendant: Accordant Communications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00787
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Sayers Construction, LLC, re #5 MOTION to Vacate Final Arbitration Award filed by Plaintiff Sayers Construction, LLC (Griffith, Casey)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Vacate Final Arbitration Award by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Griffith, Casey)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Nonopposition to Motion to Consolidate and Certificate of Conference by Accordant Communications, LLC re #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Lang, Shannon)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon A. Lang on behalf of Accordant Communications, LLC. Attorney Shannon A. Lang added to party Accordant Communications, LLC(pty:dft) (Lang, Shannon)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Accordant Communications, LLC, re #5 MOTION to Vacate Final Arbitration Award filed by Plaintiff Sayers Construction, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Alex)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Accordant Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Roberts, Alex)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Alex B. Roberts added to party Accordant Communications, LLC(pty:dft) by Accordant Communications, LLC.(Roberts, Alex)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate Final Arbitration Award by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit M. Barbee Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - May 9, 2019 Order on Accordant Communication, LLC's Application for Award on Fees, Costs and Interest and Final Award, #3 Affidavit M. Sayers Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2-A - Master Agreement for Contract Services, #5 Exhibit 3 - March 22, 2019 Partial Award, #6 Exhibit 4 - Accordant Communication, LLC's April 6, 2019 Application for Award of Fees, Costs, and Interest, #7 Exhibit 5 - Sayers' Response to Application for Fees, Costs, and Interest)(Griffith, Casey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Griffith, Casey)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Accordant Communications, LLC. (cj)
August 7, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
August 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Griffith, Casey) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 8/7/2019) (cj).
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Application to Vacate Arbitration Award ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12445633), filed by Sayers Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Master Agreement for Contract Services, #2 Exhibit May 9, 2019 Order on Accordant Communication, LLC's Application for Award of Fees, Costs and Interest and Final Award, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Griffith, Casey) (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 8/7/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayers Construction, LLC v. Accordant Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accordant Communications, LLC
Represented By: Alex B. Roberts
Represented By: Shannon A. Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayers Construction, LLC
Represented By: Maeghan E. Whitehead
Represented By: Michael Collin Barbee
Represented By: Casey Lee Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?