WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. v. Vubeology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: WAG Acquisition, L.L.C.
Defendant: Vubeology, Inc. and Does 1-20
Case Number: 1:2019cv00805
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 155 Case Transfer and Opening Letter mailed to all counsel. (cj)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Order Directing Ronald Abramson, Ari Jason Jaffess, Mord Michael Lewis, David G. Liston, and Justin Taylor Quinn to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
August 14, 2019 Filing 153 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
August 14, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vubeology, Inc., WAG Acquisition, L.L.C.. (cj)
August 14, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
August 14, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
August 14, 2019 Filing 152 Case electronically transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:14-cv-04531.
August 13, 2019 *** Civil Case Terminated *** (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #138 Report and Recommendations. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 150 OPINION Adopting Report and Recommendation. etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 8/13/2019. (dam, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 149 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #148 Scheduling Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER: The parties shall submit to the Court a joint status report that sets forth: The discovery that remains to be completed in each case; proposed deadline for the completion of discovery, service of expert reports and the completion of all expert discovery; There will be a telephone status conference in these matters on 4/23/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/14/2019. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting #145 and #146 Motion to Seal Document re Report and Recommendation; Plaintiff has complied with the structures of Local Civil Rule 5.3(c) and 7.1; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 01/07/2019. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #146 MOTION to Seal Document #138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 146 MOTION to Seal Document #138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #145 MOTION to Seal Document #139 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, #144 Response (NOT Motion),, . Motion set for 1/7/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 145 MOTION to Seal Document #139 Objection to Report and Recommendations,, #144 Response (NOT Motion),, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Objection to Report & Recommendation, #3 Redacted Response to Report & Recommendation, #4 Appendix - Index Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(3), #5 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Findings of Fact, #6 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 144 RESPONSE re #139 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 179 Motion to Seal, 175 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in case 2:14-cv-2340-ES-MAH, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.; Any renewed motion to seal shall be filed no later than December 14, 2018, etc. re #142 MOTION to Seal Document.; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/26/2018. (sms, ) Modified on 11/29/2018 (th). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 25, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #142 MOTION to Seal Document #138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC . Motion set for 12/18/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 21, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION to Seal Document #138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re (1 in 2:14-cv-04531-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C., (1 in 2:15-cv-03581-ES-MAH) Complaint, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, LLC by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Redacted Version of Document to Be Sealed, #3 Proposed Findings of Fact, #4 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER, granting WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. ("WAG") request for an eight (8) day extension for its Response to Defendants' Objection to Judge Hammer's October 23, 2018 Report and Recommendations in the above-referenced case. WAG response is extended to Wednesday, November 28. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 11/20/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 140 Letter from Ronald Abramson re Unopposed Request for Extension to File Response re #139 Objection to Report and Recommendations,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 6, 2018 Filing 139 OBJECTION to #138 Report and Recommendations by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 138 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re Defendants' motions to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) or, in the alternative, to dismiss or transfer for improper venue under the patent venue statute, 28 U.S.C. 1400(b); Objections, if any, to R&R due by 11/6/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/22/2018. (sms) Modified on 8/13/2019 (dam, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 137 NOTICE by VUBEOLOGY, INC. OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER K. SHEFFIELD, ESQ. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 LETTER ORDER terminating Defendants' #124 Motion to Dismiss for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, or alternatively, to dismiss for improper venue, or to transfer, etc. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 06/29/2018. (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Oral Argument Conference held on 3/28/2018. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 135 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 TEXT ORDER: Oral Argument set for 3/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/28/2018. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 FINDINGS OF FACT CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #131 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/27/18. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 13, 2018 Filing 132 NOTICE by VUBEOLOGY, INC. OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE OF ADRIANE M. SCOLA, ESQ. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #131 MOTION to Seal Document #125 Brief,,,, #127 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #128 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, . Motion set for 2/20/2018 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 16, 2018 Filing 131 MOTION to Seal Document #125 Brief,,,, #127 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, #128 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Support of Motion, #4 Proposed Redactions to Brief in Opposition to Motion, #5 Proposed Redactions to Reply Brief in Support of Motion, #6 Exhibit 11 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #7 Exhibit 12 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #8 Exhibit 13 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #9 Exhibit 14 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #10 Exhibit 16 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #11 Exhibit 17 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #12 Exhibit 18 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #13 Exhibit 20 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #14 Exhibit 21 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #15 Exhibit 22 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #16 Exhibit 23 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #17 Exhibit 24 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #18 Exhibit 26 to Nov. 22, 2017 Quinn Decl., #19 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER permitting parties a one-week extension of time, until 1/16/18, to file a motion to seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/10/18. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 9, 2018 Filing 129 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 26, 2017 Filing 128 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by VUBEOLOGY, INC. re #124 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 127 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #124 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #124 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/18/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by VUBEOLOGY, INC. re #125 Brief,,,, #124 MOTION to Dismiss (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 125 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS [ECF NO. 124] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2017 Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shawn Boday, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER terminating w/out prejudice #116 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall make any motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter, and to dismiss or transfer for improper venue under 1406(a) on or before November 22, 2017; any opposition shall be filed by December 19, 2017; any reply shall be filed by December 26, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/2/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 26, 2017 Filing 122 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 29, 2017 Filing 121 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by VUBEOLOGY, INC. re #116 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 23, 2017 Filing 120 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. enclosing the parties Joint Claim Construction Statement. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction Statement, #2 Exhibit A and B)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 22, 2017 Filing 119 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #116 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mord M. Lewis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER extending Claim Construction Deadlines, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/17. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Filing 117 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess regarding Joint Request for Extension of Claim Construction Deadlines. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 31, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #116 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE. Motion set for 8/21/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2017 Filing 116 MOTION to Dismiss OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B (Part 1), #5 Exhibit B (Part 2), #6 Declaration of Shawn Boday, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 12, 2017 Filing 115 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting Defendants' #112 Letter requesting leave of Court to take the deposition of Patrick O'Brien following the close of fact discovery, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 07/05/2017. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND ORDER granting #103 Motion to Seal Document, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 07/05/2017. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 30, 2017 Filing 112 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER permitting Defendants a 3-week extension of all claim construction deadlines; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/29/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER permitting Defendants a 3-week extension of all claim construction deadlines; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/29/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 28, 2017 Filing 109 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER extending Fact Discovery deadline until 7/13/2017 for the limited purpose of taking Mr. Perkins's deposition; all other fact discovery shall be fully completed by the June 30, 2017 deadline; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/27/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 22, 2017 Filing 107 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. raising a discovery dispute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER permitting Alex Patchen, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 6/12/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 12, 2017 Filing 105 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. raising dispute regarding TC Heartland LLC v. Kraft Foods Group Brands (May 22, 2017). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 104 Letter from Ronald Abramson regarding Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Alex G. Patchen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, #2 Declaration of Alex G. Patchen, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #103 MOTION to Seal Document #102 Letter,,, . Motion set for 7/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 103 MOTION to Seal Document #102 Letter,,, by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of David G. Liston, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted May 24, 2017 Letter, #4 Redacted Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer to May 24, 2017 Letter, #5 Appendix 1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #6 Appendix 2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #7 A1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #8 A2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #9 Redacted A3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #10 Redacted A4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #11 Redacted A5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #12 Redacted A6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #13 A7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #14 A8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #15 Redacted A9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #16 A10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #17 Redacted A11 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #18 Exhibit D1 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #19 Exhibit D2 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #20 Exhibit D3 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #21 Redacted Ex. D4 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #22 Redacted Ex. D5 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #23 Redacted Ex. D6 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #24 Redacted Ex. D7 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #25 Exhibit D8 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #26 Exhibit D9 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #27 Exhibit D10 to May 24, 2017 Letter, #28 Redacted Ex A (WAG), #29 Exhibit B (WAG), #30 Certificate of Service)(LISTON, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 24, 2017 Filing 102 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Tab A - Proposed Amended Answer, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 A1, #5 A2, #6 A3, #7 A4, #8 A5, #9 A6, #10 A7, #11 A8, #12 A9, #13 A10, #14 A11, #15 Exhibit D1, #16 Exhibit D2, #17 Exhibit D3, #18 Exhibit D4, #19 Exhibit D5, #20 Exhibit D6, #21 Exhibit D7, #22 Exhibit D8, #23 Exhibit D9, #24 Exhibit D10, #25 Exhibit A (WAG), #26 Exhibit B (WAG))(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER/AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/18/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 16, 2017 Filing 100 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing a proposed Amended Discovery Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #98 Joint Letter Motion re: Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/30/17. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #98 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan. Motion set for 5/1/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Filing 98 Joint MOTION Joint Letter Motion regarding Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs proposed Amended Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 24, 2017 Filing 97 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TEXT ORDER: The Status Conference set for 2/24/2017 is adjourned without a new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/21/2017. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW/ORDER granting #88 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/4/17. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Order/Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to the 3/18/70 Hague Convention on the taking of evidence abroad in civil or commercial matters. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/16. (sr, ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/14/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 93 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #88 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #86 Letter,, #81 Letter,, , #90 Exhibit (to Document),. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redacted Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 92 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #91 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 8, 2016 Filing 91 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 90 Exhibit to #89 Letter by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 7, 2016 Filing 89 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 87 Order,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #88 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #86 Letter,, #81 Letter,, . Motion set for 1/3/2017 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 88 Joint MOTION to Seal Document #86 Letter,, #81 Letter,, by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law & Order, #3 Redacted November 3, 2016 Letter of Defendants, #4 Redacted Ex. A to November 3, 2016 Letter, #5 Redacted November 21, 2016 Letter of Plaintiff, #6 Certificate of Service)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to continue to meet and confer regarding Defendants' request that their Letter of Request be signed. If the parties are unable to resolve this matter on their own, they shall appear in the courtroom of the Undersigned on December 8, 2016 at 9:00 a.m. for an in person meet and confer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/22/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 21, 2016 Filing 86 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #81 Letter,,. (ABRAMSON, RONALD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE of Appearance by MORD MICHAEL LEWIS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (LEWIS, MORD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 15, 2016 Filing 84 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #83 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 83 Letter from Ari J. Jaffess re #82 Letter, #81 Letter,,. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 14, 2016 Filing 82 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #81 Letter,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 3, 2016 Filing 81 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Request)(QUINN, JUSTIN)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER/AMENDED DISCOVERY PLAN; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that Defendants' request that the Court limit the number of claims that Plaintiff can assert is DENIED, and that Plaintiff's request that the Court limit the number of prior art references by Defendants is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 10/14/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 78 Joint Discovery Plan by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C..(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 7, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/7/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/7/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. Counsel for plaintiff will initiate the call to 973-776-7858. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/30/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2016 Text Only Minute Entry for an oral opinion placed on the record re #47 Motion to Bifurcate by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/2016. See order #76 . (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #47 Motion to Bifurcate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 9/29/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is cancelled. A new date and time for the call will be scheduled shortly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 8/3/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference call scheduled for today is adjourned to Wednesday, August 3, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/29/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 72 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 27, 2016 Filing 75 Transcript of Motion Hearing Proceedings held on July 15, 2016, before Judge Michael A. Hammer. Court Reporter/Transcriber King Transcription Services (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 8/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2016. (mfr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Motion Hearing held on 7/15/2016 re #47 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery filed by VUBEOLOGY, INC. Decision Reserved. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall forthwith continue to meet & confer in an attempt to resolve the issue raised in their June 23, 2016 letter to the Court. There will be a telephone conference call with counsel on July 29, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. to advise the Court regarding the status of their meet & confer and this outstanding issue. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 7/15/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' June 23, 2016 joint letter, the Court adjourns Plaintiff's June 23, 2016 deadline to submit responses to Defendants invalidity contentions and the July 6, 2016 deadline to exchange proposed terms of construction. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the positions and arguments raised in the June 23, 2016 joint letter before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on July 15, 2016. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 7/5/2016. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 23, 2016 Filing 69 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 TEXT ORDER: There will be Oral Argument on the pending motion to bifurcate #47 on July 15, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 5/25/16. (TAD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 29, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JENNIFER K. SHEFFIELD, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2016 Filing 67 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jennifer K. Sheffield, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number 0312-7006163.) (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/28/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re #63 Letter GRANTING the application for the pro hac vice admission of Jennifer K. Sheffield, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 03/24/2016. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 23, 2016 Filing 64 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 22, 2016 Filing 63 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing pro hac vice application of Jennifer K. Sheffield, Esq. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin T. Quinn, Esq., #2 Declaration of Jennifer K. Sheffield, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 17, 2016 Filing 62 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney PHILLIP G. RAY and DAVID A. WARD terminated. Attorney JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN for VUBEOLOGY, INC. added.. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER: On or before March 23, 2016, the parties are directed to file a revised discovery confidentiality order consistent with the Court's rulings of March 9, 2016. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/10/16. (Dunican, T) Modified on 3/10/2016 (jqb, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/9/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 7, 2016 Filing 60 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #47 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Sur-Reply) (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 TEXT ORDER: Today's Telephone Conference is adjourned to 3/9/2016 at 3:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/7/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that WAG shall be permitted to file a sur-reply brief not to exceed 5 pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/4/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 57 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re #56 Letter. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 3, 2016 Filing 56 Letter from Ronald Abramson re #47 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 1, 2016 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by VUBEOLOGY, INC. re #47 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (Corrected Signature) (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 29, 2016 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by VUBEOLOGY, INC. re #47 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/7/2016 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/25/2016. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 23, 2016 Filing 52 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. re 48 Order,,. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 51 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #47 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER permitting the parties an extension, until 2/23/16, to comply with the Court's 2/8/16 Text Order RE: remaining disputes in the Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/17/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 49 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. (QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TEXT ORDER:The Court has reviewed the parties' February 5, 2016 letter presenting disputes between the parties regarding the form of the Discovery Confidentiality Order. The Court directs the parties to immediately resume their efforts to meet and confer on this dispute. If the parties cannot resolve their issues, then they shall submit, by February 17, 2016, a revised letter presenting any remaining disputes. The revised joint letter also shall explain why the Court's standard Discovery Confidentiality Order (Appendix S to the New Jersey Federal Practice Rules) is insufficient. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/16/16. (Dunican, T) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 47 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate Liability and Damages Discovery by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 46 Transcript of Proceedings of Scheduling Conference held on January 22, 2016, before Judge MICHAEL A. HAMMER. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (ek) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 5, 2016 Filing 45 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER RE: discovery schedule; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 2/1/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 29, 2016 Filing 43 Letter from Ronald Abramson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER pursuant to Fed.R.Evid.502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER regarding E-Discovery in Patent Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 1/26/16. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Scheduling Conference held on 1/22/2016. (ECR) (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 19, 2016 Filing 40 Letter from Justin T. Quinn, Esq. to the Honorable Michael A. Hammer, U.S.M.J. enclosing Joint Discovery Plan, E-Discovery Order, and Rule 502(d) Order. (Attachments: #1 Joint Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order re: Electronic Discovery, #3 Proposed Rule 502(d) Order)(QUINN, JUSTIN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
December 1, 2015 Reset Hearing: The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 has been adjourned to 1/22/2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 19, 2015 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VUBEOLOGY, INC. identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 17, 2015 Filing 38 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG re #37 Letter. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 16, 2015 Filing 37 Letter from David Ward. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 16, 2015 Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2015 at 12:00 p.m. in Newark - Courtroom 2C before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 11/13/2015. (jqb, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 12, 2015 Filing 35 Letter from Ronald Abramson for Plaintiff WAG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX 1-PTAB Decision on 011 Patent, #2 Exhibit EX 2-PTAB Decision on 141 Patent, #3 Exhibit EX 3-PTAB Decsiion on 611 Patent, #4 Exhibit EX 4-PTAB Decision on 839 Patent)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 5, 2015 Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson no longer assigned to case. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
November 2, 2015 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by VUBEOLOGY, INC..(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 26, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Update - The document #33 Stipulation and Order submitted by VUBEOLOGY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/2/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME for Deft. to answer Cmp. until 11/2/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/26/15. (DD, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 23, 2015 Filing 32 Letter from David Ward. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 25, 2015 Answer Due Deadline Update - RE: #31 Order as to deft, VUBEOLOGY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/26/15. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER granting Defendants' application to file answer to WAG Acquisition, LLC's Complaints until 10/26/15. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/24/15. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 30 Letter from Keith J. Miller, Esq. to the Honorable Esther Salas, U.S.D.J. and the Honorable Joseph A. Dickson, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPINION AND ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Defendants motion to dismiss in each of the consolidated cases, the Clerk shall terminate WebPowers motion to dismiss in Civil Action No. 15-3581, D.E. No. 9, and the parties shall engage in limited jurisdictional discovery regarding the Courts personal jurisdiction over Defendant Coolvision.. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/10/15. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 29, 2015 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Motion Hearing held on 7/29/2015 re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) filed by VUBEOLOGY, INC. Decision Reserved. (Court Reporter Lynne Johnson.) (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 28, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILLIP G. RAY on behalf of All Defendants (RAY, PHILLIP) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 11, 2015 Pro Hac Vice counsel, BRIAN G. BODINE, STEVEN B. WINTERS and ADRIANE M. SCOLA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adriane Scola, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven Winters, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 10, 2015 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Brian Bodine, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
June 9, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by ARI JASON JAFFESS on behalf of WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. (JAFFESS, ARI) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
May 28, 2015 Set Hearings: Please be advised that Oral Argument for the pending Motion to Dismiss has been scheduled for 7/29/2015 at 10:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
March 10, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 450, receipt number NEW023003 RE: Brian G. Bodine, Steven B. Winters, Adriane M. Scola. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER permitting Brian G. Bodine to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/25/15. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
February 23, 2015 Filing 21 DECLARATION of David Ward in Support of Application for Admissions Pro Hac Vice by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian G. Bodine, Esq., #2 Declaration of Steven B. Winters, Esq., #3 Declaration of Adriane M. Scola, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 20 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by VUBEOLOGY, INC. re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Defendants' Joint Reply Brief In Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints) (MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss). Motion set for 2/17/2015 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 19 BRIEF in Opposition filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald Abramson, Esq., #2 Exhibit 1 to Abramson Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Abramson Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Abramson Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Abramson Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Abramson Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Abramson Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Abramson Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Abramson Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Abramson Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Abramson Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Abramson Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Abramson Declaration, #14 Certificate of Service)(ABRAMSON, RONALD)[Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
January 12, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss (Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss) by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Leonid Radvinsky, #3 Declaration of Noam Fogel, #4 Declaration of Michael A. Innes, Esq., #5 Exhibit 1 to Innes Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to Innes Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to Innes Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to Innes Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 to Innes Declaration, #10 Exhibit 6 to Innes Declaration, #11 Exhibit 7 to Innes Declaration, #12 Exhibit 8 to Innes Declaration, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(MILLER, KEITH) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE: parties' briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/8/14. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 6, 2014 Filing 16 Letter from All Counsel Regarding Briefing of Motions To Dimiss. (WETTRE, LEDA) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER consolidating cv-14-4531 with 14-1661 14-2340,14-2345,14-2674,14-2832,14-3196,14-3456 for discovery purposes ONLY. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 10/6/14. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 29, 2014 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Esther Salas: Telephone Conference held on 9/29/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 24, 2014 Reset Hearings: Please be advised that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 10/1/2014 has been RESCHEDULED to 11/5/2014 at 12:00 PM before Judge Esther Salas. A Telephone Conference has been scheduled for 9/29/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Esther Salas. Plaintiffs counsel shall coordinate the call. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 22, 2014 Filing 13 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq. to Hon. Esther Salas re Proposed Order re 11 Order,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order)(ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 18, 2014 Filing 12 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vubeology, Inc. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER. In response to docket entry 8, the Court requests that the parties provide a joint proposed order on the issues therein by no later than the close of business on Monday, September 22nd. So Ordered by Judge Esther Salas on 9/17/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 9, 2014 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. VUBEOLOGY, INC. served on 7/24/2014, answer due 8/28/2014. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SCHEDULING. Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5A before Judge Esther Salas. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 9/4/2014. (ps, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
September 3, 2014 Filing 8 Letter from Ronald Abramson, Esq.. (ABRAMSON, RONALD) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 29, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/6/2014 before Judge Esther Salas. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 28, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by VUBEOLOGY, INC.. Responses due by 9/22/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 15, 2014 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by VUBEOLOGY, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/28/14. (sr, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 14, 2014 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Vubeology, Inc... (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
August 14, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. WARD on behalf of VUBEOLOGY, INC. (WARD, DAVID) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 23, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to VUBEOLOGY, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 3 AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.] (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 8/14/2019) (cj).
July 17, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.]
July 17, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-20, VUBEOLOGY, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5815642) with JURY DEMAND, filed by WAG ACQUISITION, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Form AO-120 Report on Filing Patent Action, #2 Related Case Statement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 8/14/2019.] (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 8/14/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAG Acquisition, L.L.C. v. Vubeology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAG Acquisition, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ronald Abramson
Represented By: David G. Liston
Represented By: MORD MICHAEL LEWIS
Represented By: ARI JASON JAFFESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vubeology, Inc.
Represented By: JUSTIN TAYLOR QUINN
Represented By: PHILLIP G. RAY
Represented By: DAVID A. WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?