Horton V. Gigg Express, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Horton
Defendant: Kalia Mahesh and Gigg Express, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00824
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER VACATING #5 Order to Show Cause filed by Robert Horton. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Robert Horton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gwen W. Tipton)(Wolcott, Craig)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE by Robert Horton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Gwen W. Tipton)(Wolcott, Craig)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Gwen Wiesen Tipton to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100036808) on behalf of Robert Horton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Receipt)(lt)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Robert Horton. Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Gwen W. Tipton to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
August 21, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, Supplement to JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet by Gigg Express, Inc., Kalia Mahesh. (Beckelman, Michael)
August 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gigg Express, Inc., Robert Horton, Kalia Mahesh. (dl)
August 20, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
August 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kalia Mahesh, Gigg Express, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12502209), filed by Kalia Mahesh, Gigg Express, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Beckelman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton V. Gigg Express, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalia Mahesh
Represented By: Michael Scott Beckelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gigg Express, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott Beckelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Horton
Represented By: Craig Stephen Wolcott
Represented By: Gwen Wiesen Tipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?