Cranor v. 5 Star Nutrition, LLC
Plaintiff: Lucas Cranor
Defendant: 5 Star Nutrition, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00908
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by 5 Star Nutrition, LLC, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant 5 Star Nutrition, LLC (Whittlesey, David)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 5 Star Nutrition, LLC. (Whittlesey, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lucas Cranor, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant 5 Star Nutrition, LLC (Keogh, Keith)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 15, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #9 MOTION to supplement re #8 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document Certificate of Conference. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Supplement re #8 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document Certificate of Conference by 5 Star Nutrition, LLC. (Whittlesey, David) Modified on 10/15/2019 (td).
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document, #2 Proposed Order) (Whittlesey, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by 5 Star Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Whittlesey, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2019: #2 Sealed Document Exhibit A) (td).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Keith J. Keogh. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lucas Cranor. 5 Star Nutrition, LLC served on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Bingham, Benjamin)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin R. Bingham for Keith J. Keogh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12624568) by on behalf of Lucas Cranor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bingham, Benjamin)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 5 Star Nutrition, LLC. (dl)
September 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lucas Cranor. (dl)
September 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
September 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Lucas Cranor. (Bingham, Benjamin) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/16/2019 to flatten image) (dl).
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12606715), filed by Lucas Cranor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bingham, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cranor v. 5 Star Nutrition, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Cranor
Represented By: Benjamin R. Bingham
Represented By: Keith J. Keogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 5 Star Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: David Philip Whittlesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?