Kline v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Plaintiff: Shawn Kline
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00955
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James R Nowlin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Parties by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Wickern, Alyssa)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ADVISORY. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (dm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties by Shawn Kline. (Wilson, Chad)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order Pursuant to Rule 16 of the FRCP by Shawn Kline. (Wilson, Chad)
October 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Shawn Kline. (Wilson, Chad)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT by American Strategic Insurance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B-supplement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C-supplement)(Wickern, Alyssa)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
September 30, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by American Strategic Insurance Corp., Shawn Kline. (cj)
September 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
September 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ASI Lloyds Insurance Company (Incorrectly named as American Strategic Insurance Corp) (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12665573), filed by ASI Lloyds Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Original petition and Defendants original answer-Travis County, #3 Exhibit List of all counsel of record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement JS 44)(Ramirez, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kline v. American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Kline
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Represented By: Tara L. Peveto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corp.
Represented By: Joshua Lee Nicholls
Represented By: Michael I. Ramirez
Represented By: Alyssa P. Wickern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?