MTGLQ Investors, L.P., v. Walden, Jr et al
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,
Defendant: Jerry K Walden, Jr, Tamatha Walden and Jerry K. Walden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00992
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants Jerry K. Walden, Jr. and Tamatha Walden shall reply to Plaintiff MTGLQ Investors, L.P.'s response, (Dkt. 8), to their motion to dismiss, (Dkt. 7), on or before December 10, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 Appendix, #8 Response to Motion, by Tamatha Walden, Jerry K Walden, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to File Reply)(Davis, William)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 APPENDIX to #8 Response to Motion, by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,, re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under FRCP 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss under Doctrine of Abstention filed by Defendant Tamatha Walden, Defendant Jerry K Walden, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cronenwett, Mark)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(1), Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim under FRCP 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss under Doctrine of Abstention by Tamatha Walden, Jerry K Walden, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Davis, William)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,. Tamatha Walden served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Cronenwett, Mark)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,. Jerry K Walden, Jr served on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tamatha Walden, Jerry K Walden, Jr. (dl)
October 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,. (All Defendants) (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,. (Cronenwett, Mark)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12720262). No Summons requested at this time, filed by MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTGLQ Investors, L.P., v. Walden, Jr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry K Walden, Jr
Represented By: William Donald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamatha Walden
Represented By: William Donald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry K. Walden
Represented By: William Donald Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTGLQ Investors, L.P.,
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Represented By: Robert T. Lieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?