Carmel Capital, LLC v. Move, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Carmel Capital, LLC
Defendant: Move, Inc. and Builders Digital Experience, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00993
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for Defendant Move, Inc. by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Janik, Glenn)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Builders Digital Experience, LLC answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Builders Digital Experience, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cavazos, Edward)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; Move, Inc. answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Janik, Glenn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Move, Inc. served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Janik, Glenn)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Builders Digital Experience, LLC served on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Janik, Glenn)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Builders Digital Experience, LLC, Move, Inc.. (dl)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Carmel Capital, LLC. for Defendants Move, Inc. and Builders Digital Experience, LLC (Janik, Glenn)
October 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carmel Capital, LLC. (dl)
October 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Janik, Glenn)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12721356), filed by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Janik, Glenn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmel Capital, LLC v. Move, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Move, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Builders Digital Experience, LLC
Represented By: Brian Christopher Nash
Represented By: Edward A. Cavazos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmel Capital, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Edward Janik
Represented By: Rajkumar Vinnakota
Represented By: Sean N. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?