Cat and Dogma, LLC v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: Cat and Dogma, LLC
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01002
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Target Corporation. (Clark, Deborah)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Peter M. Routhier ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12965708) by on behalf of Target Corporation. (Clark, Deborah) Modified on 12/13/2019 (td).
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Peter M. Routhier. (td)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF STIPULATED DEADLINE FOR RESPONDING TO THE COMPLAINT by Target Corporation (Clark, Deborah)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Target Corporation. (cj)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
October 15, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cat and Dogma, LLC. (cj)
October 15, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
October 15, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cat and Dogma, LLC. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 10/16/2019) (cj).
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12727468). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Cat and Dogma, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 10/16/2019) (cj). (Attachment 4 replaced and flattened on 10/16/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cat and Dogma, LLC v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Deborah G. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cat and Dogma, LLC
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?