Texas Democratic Party et al v. Hughs
Plaintiff: Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee and Emily Gilby
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Case Number: 1:2019cv01063
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 30 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Filed Jointly by Ruth Hughs and by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Emily Gilby, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Geise, John)
December 24, 2019 Filing 29 APPENDIX to #28 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Emily Gilby, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1-Declaration of J. Geise, #2 Exhibit Ex A-Texas Tribune Article, #3 Exhibit Ex B-Declaration of D. DeBeauvoir, #4 Exhibit Ex C-Election Advisory No. 2019-20, #5 Exhibit Ex D-Williamson Co. 2020 EV Schedule)(Geise, John)
December 24, 2019 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Emily Gilby, Texas Democratic Party, re #21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Ruth Hughs (Geise, John)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #23 Motion for Jyoti Jasrasaria to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' #25 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Emily Gilby, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Geise, John)
December 19, 2019 Filing 24 ATTACHMENT -- Proposed Order to #23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Jyoti Jasrasaria ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12990104) by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Emily Gilby, Texas Democratic Party. (Hardin, John)
December 19, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin - Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice - Jyoti Jasrasaria ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12990104) by on behalf of Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Emily Gilby, Texas Democratic Party. (Hardin, John)
December 18, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Ruth Hughs. (Sweeten, Patrick)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
December 10, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation on Motion to Dismiss by Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ruth Hughs amending #1 Complaint, filed by Texas Democratic Party, Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Emily Gilby.(dm)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas Democratic Party, Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee. Ruth Hughs served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Hardin, John)
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Ruth Hughs. (dm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party. (Hardin, John)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin J. Hamilton. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexi Machek Velez. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John M. Geise. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as tp Marc E. Elias. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Ruth Hughs. (cj)
October 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
October 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin --Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Kevin J. Hamilton-- ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12790257) by on behalf of Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin --Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Alexi Machek Velez-- ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12790194) by on behalf of Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin --Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice John M. Geise-- ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12790144) by on behalf of Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Russell Hardin --Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Marc E. Elias-- ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12790003) by on behalf of Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hardin, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party. (Hardin, John)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee, Texas Democratic Party. (Hardin, John) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 10/30/2019) (cj).
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT --Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief-- ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12789660), filed by Texas Democratic Party, Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee, Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hardin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Democratic Party et al v. Hughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Represented By: Matthew Hamilton Frederick
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Represented By: Michael Abrams
Represented By: Dominique Gelene Stafford
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Disher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Congressional Campaign Committee
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Represented By: John M. Geise
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Democratic Party
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Represented By: John M. Geise
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Democratic Senatorial Campaign Committee
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Represented By: John M. Geise
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Gilby
Represented By: John Russell Hardin
Represented By: Alexi Machek Velez
Represented By: John M. Geise
Represented By: Jyoti Jasrasaria
Represented By: Kevin J. Hamilton
Represented By: Marc Erik Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?