Mgbeoduru v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Nicholas Mgbeoduru
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01067
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James R Nowlin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by General Motors, LLC. (Leonard, Erika)
December 19, 2019 Filing 7 General Motors, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors, LLC.(Leonard, Erika)
November 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: General Motors, LLC answer due 12/23/2019. (td)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant General Motors LLC's answer is now due on or before December 23, 2019. entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (gc)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by General Motors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer)(Leonard, Erika)
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Mgbeoduru. General Motors, LLC served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Howard, Logan)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (cj)
October 31, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Nicholas Mgbeoduru. (cj)
October 31, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
October 31, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Nicholas Mgbeoduru. (Howard, Logan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12794327), filed by Nicholas Mgbeoduru. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howard, Logan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mgbeoduru v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Mgbeoduru
Represented By: Logan E. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Erika L. Leonard
Represented By: Tara Moriarty Kumpf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?