Swissmarine Services, SA v. XCoal Energy and Resources et al
Plaintiff: Swissmarine Services, SA
Defendant: XCoal Energy and Resources
Garnishee: PNC Bank National Association and Glencore, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv01143
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDER that the attachments of XCoal's property held by Garnishees PNC Bank, National Association and Glencore Ltd. authorized by the Court's November 27, 2019, Order are VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
December 27, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Swissmarine Services, SA (Smith, Michael)
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment, Verified Complaint and Order upon PNC Bank by Swissmarine Services, SA (Smith, Michael)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnshment, Verified Complaint and Order upon PNC Bank by Swissmarine Services, SA re #11 Writ Issued (Smith, Michael)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. (dm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. (dm)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #5 Request for Issue of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for J. Stephen Simms to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Swissmarine Services, SA. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Pretrial Order for Appointment for Service by Swissmarine Services, SA. (Smith, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to XCoal Energy and Resources. (cj)
November 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Order for Issuance of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by Swissmarine Services, SA. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Supplement Process of Marine Attachment and Garnishment, #4 Supplement Process of Marine Attachment and Garnishment)(Smith, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. Stephen Simms ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12884088) by on behalf of Swissmarine Services, SA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Swissmarine Services, SA. (Smith, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Swissmarine Services, SA. (Smith, Michael)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12883304), filed by Swissmarine Services, SA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swissmarine Services, SA v. XCoal Energy and Resources et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XCoal Energy and Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swissmarine Services, SA
Represented By: Michael J. Smith
Represented By: Laura S. Fowler
Represented By: J. Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: PNC Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Glencore, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?