Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Tyco Fire and Security UAE LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Jeffrey Arbogust and Tyco Fire and Security UAE LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01195
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Palmer, Robert)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. as to Tyco Fire and Security UAE LLC. Waiver sent on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Palmer, Robert)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jeffrey Arbogust. (dm)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Palmer, Robert)
December 9, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
December 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12940771). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Palmer, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Tyco Fire and Security UAE LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Arbogust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire and Security UAE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert J. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?