Kinsinger et al v. Cirrus Design Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kerri Kinsinger, David Kinsinger, Joseph Kinsinger and Jacob Kinsinger
Defendant: Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD., Garmin AT, Inc., Cirrus Design Corporation and Garmin International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01212
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding case style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal as to Certain Defendants. Defendants Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin AT, Inc., and Garmin, LTD. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
February 5, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cirrus Design Corporation amending, filed by David Kinsinger.(Sanger, Ladd)
February 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Kinsinger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal)(Sanger, Ladd)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ross Cunningham for Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13124629) by on behalf of Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Ross)
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 Pro Hac Vice Letter to Joseph R. Alexander, Jr. (td)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Answer by Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin USA, Inc., Garmin, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Ross)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kinsinger. Garmin USA, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Sanger, Ladd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kinsinger. Garmin International, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Sanger, Ladd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Kinsinger. Garmin AT, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Sanger, Ladd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Kinsinger, David Kinsinger, Joseph Kinsinger, Kerri Kinsinger. Garmin USA, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 by David Kinsinger, Kerri Kinsinger, Joseph Kinsinger, Jacob Kinsinger (Sanger, Ladd)
January 9, 2020 Notice of Correction: re #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service. Filer selected wrong event, correction has been made. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Kinsinger, David Kinsinger, Joseph Kinsinger, Kerri Kinsinger. Garmin International, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020 (Sanger, Ladd) Modified on 1/9/2020 to correct event (td).
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacob Kinsinger, David Kinsinger, Joseph Kinsinger, Kerri Kinsinger. Garmin AT, Inc. served on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Sanger, Ladd) Modified on 1/9/2020 to correct event (td).
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Kinsinger as to Cirrus Design Corporation. Waiver sent on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Sanger, Ladd)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cirrus Design Corporation, Garmin AT, Inc., Garmin International, Inc., Garmin, LTD, Garmin USA, Inc. (lt)
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by David Kinsinger. (Sanger, Ladd)
December 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Kinsinger. (dl)
December 13, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
December 13, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12965516). No Summons requested at this time, filed by David Kinsinger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanger, Ladd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinsinger et al v. Cirrus Design Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerri Kinsinger
Represented By: Ladd Charles Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kinsinger
Represented By: Ladd Charles Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Kinsinger
Represented By: Ladd Charles Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Kinsinger
Represented By: Ladd Charles Sanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Cunningham
Represented By: Joseph R. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin, LTD.
Represented By: Ross Cunningham
Represented By: Joseph R. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin AT, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Cunningham
Represented By: Joseph R. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cirrus Design Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garmin International, Inc.
Represented By: Ross Cunningham
Represented By: Joseph R. Alexander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?