Association Insurance Company v. Clarendon National Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Association Insurance Company
Defendant: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01248
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Clarendon National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Paul Amirata, #2 Proposed Order)(Feemster, William)
February 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Association Insurance Company. Clarendon National Insurance Company served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (Greene, Mary)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clarendon National Insurance Company. (td)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Association Insurance Company. (Greene, Mary)
December 26, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
December 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13011532). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Association Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Orignal Petition, #2 Exhibit Shelton's ltr to Sussex, #3 Exhibit Settlment Agreement, #4 Exhibit Policy NO GLP 016984800, #5 Exhibit policy no GLP 016984801, #6 Exhibit poicy no GLP 016984802, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greene, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association Insurance Company v. Clarendon National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Cazes Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon National Insurance Company
Represented By: William Carlton Feemster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?