Langley v. International Business Machines Corporation

Plaintiff: Jonathan Langley
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
In Re: Subpoena to Magnanimo and Dean, LLP
Case Number: 1:2019mc00044
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that IBM's Motion to Compel BE FILED in Langley v. International Business Machines Corporation, Cause No. A-18-CV-443-LY and FURTHER ORDERS that Cause No. A-19-MC-044-LY BE CLOSED. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (td)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 IBM's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoena and for a Protective Order, or in the Alternative, to Transfer filed by International Business Machines Corporation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. Referral Magistrate Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (lt)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 Case Opening and Transfer Letters sent to Cindi L. Ritchey, Archie Carl Pierce, Blair J. Leake, Heidi A. Coughlin, Charles A. Lamberton, Alison B. Marshall, Briah M. Jorgensen, and Matthew W. Lampe, re: Case transfer and opening. (cj)
January 17, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 17, 2019 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from Central District of California; Case Number 2:18-mc-00171.
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING IBM'S MOTION TO QUASH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott transferring case to Judge Lee Yeakel in the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Judge Lee Yeakel, U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint Stipulation Regarding IBM's Motion to Quash Third-Party Subpoena and for a Protective Order, or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, #2 Affidavit Proof of Service)(Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation, re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #10 served on 01/03/2019. (Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANT INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION'S THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER (Dkt. #1 ) by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott: Plaintiff Jonathan Langley shall file any opposition no later than January 17, 2019. Defendant IBM shall file a reply by January 24, 2019. Defendant IBM shall serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff immediately and submit a proof of service to the Court. (sbou) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #8 Non-Resident Attorney Alison B. Marshall APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant International Business Machines Corporation, designating Cindi L. Ritchey as local counsel. (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alison B. Marshall to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant International Business Machines Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22934655) filed by Defendant-Movant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation, re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 , Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #4 served on 12/18/18. (Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alison B. Marshall. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant International Business Machines Corporation, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 served on 12/12/18. (Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant-Movant International Business Machines Corporation, re MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District, #1 served on 12/12/2018. (Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant-Movant International Business Machines Corporation, identifying International Business Machines Corporation. (Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: 0973-22878690 - Fee: $47, filed by Defendant-Movant International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Diane Kennedy, #3 Declaration of Alison Marshall, #4 Proposed Order) (Attorney Cindi Lynn Ritchey added to party International Business Machines Corporation(pty:mov))(Ritchey, Cindi) [Transferred from California Central on 1/17/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langley v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Langley
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Represented By: Charles A. Lamberton
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Alison B. Marshall
Represented By: Matthew W. Lampe
Represented By: Brian M. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Subpoena to Magnanimo and Dean, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?