Hines v. Wisser et al
Plaintiff: Merlon Hines
Defendant: Stephnie McFarland, Lois Davis and W Wisser
Case Number: 1:2020cv00053
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 Case Transfer and Opening Letter mailed to Merlon Hines. (cj)
January 16, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
January 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 16, 2020 Filing 5 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Texas; Case Number 6-20-cv-00003.
January 3, 2020 Interdistrict transfer to the Western District of Texas Austin Division. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/16/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring this case to the Western District of Texas,Austin Division, forthwith and without delay. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 1/3/2020. (mjc, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/16/2020.]
January 3, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. MAILED Consent Form to plaintiff. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/16/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/16/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Merlon Hines. (mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/16/2020.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lois Davis, Stephnie McFarland, W Wisser, filed by Merlon Hines. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope(s))(mll, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 1/16/2020.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hines v. Wisser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlon Hines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephnie McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Wisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?