Moffett v. Sprouts Farmers Market
Plaintiff: Donna Moffett
Defendant: Sprouts Farmers Market
Case Number: 1:2020cv00072
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDERED that the motion, (Dkt. #5 ), is GRANTED. The parties shall proceed to arbitration. FURTHER ORDERED that this action is STAYED pending the outcome of the arbitration proceedings. FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall file a report apprising the Court of the status of the arbitration proceedings on or before May 15, 2020, and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/15/2020. (td)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration by Sprouts Farmers Market. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kumpf, Tara)
January 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna Moffett. Sprouts Farmers Market served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Simon, Kell)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sprouts Farmers Market. (cj)
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Donna Moffett. (Simon, Kell)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13107155), filed by Donna Moffett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Kell)
January 22, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Donna Moffett. (cj)
January 22, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 22, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffett v. Sprouts Farmers Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprouts Farmers Market
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Moffett
Represented By: Kell Ascher Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?