Chase v. Hodge et al
Plaintiff: Dean Chase
Defendant: Ryan E. Hodge, Stephanie Hodge and Helping Hands Capital, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00175
Filed: February 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic (tada)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Helping Hands Capital, LLC, Ryan E. Hodge, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Ryan E. Hodge, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Helping Hands Capital, LLC (Howry, Randy)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Ryan E. Hodge, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Ryan E. Hodge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hodge declaration)(Howry, Randy)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dean Chase, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Ryan E. Hodge (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Dean Chase, #2 Proposed Order Order Denying Hodge MTD)(Schmidt, C)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dean Chase, re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Helping Hands Capital, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Denying Helping Hands MTD)(Schmidt, C)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brett Turnbull. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brett Turnbull ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100038106) on behalf of Helping Hands Capital, LLC. (dm)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to C. Thomas Schmidt. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James Hatchitt. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michelle Mei-Hsue Cheng for C. Thomas Schmidt ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13289732) by on behalf of Dean Chase. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cheng, Michelle)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Helping Hands Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howry, Randy)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ryan E. Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Hodge declaration, #2 Exhibit Helping Hands COF, #3 Proposed Order)(Howry, Randy)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Mei-Hsue Cheng on behalf of Dean Chase. Attorney Michelle Mei-Hsue Cheng added to party Dean Chase(pty:pla) (Cheng, Michelle)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE regarding state court filings by Helping Hands Capital, LLC (Howry, Randy)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randy Howry ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13283435) by James Hatchitt on behalf of Helping Hands Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Howry, Randy) Modified on 3/3/2020 (dm).
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Orders Directing James Hatchitt, C. Thomas Schmidt, and Brett Turnbull to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dean Chase. (cj)
February 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Helping Hands Capital, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13217300), filed by Helping Hands Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Howry, Randy) (Attachment 4 replaced and flattened on 2/18/2020) (cj). (Attachment 5 replaced and flattened on 2/18/2020) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase v. Hodge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan E. Hodge
Represented By: Ryan D. Ellis
Represented By: Randy Howry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helping Hands Capital, LLC
Represented By: Randy Howry
Represented By: D. Brett Turnbull
Represented By: Ryan D. Ellis
Represented By: James Hatchitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Chase
Represented By: D. Brett Turnbull
Represented By: Michelle Mei-Hsue Cheng
Represented By: C Thomas Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?