Securities and Exchange Commission v. Meta 1 Coin Trust et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Peter K. Shamoun, Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoon, Nicole Bowdler, Robert P. Dunlap, David A. Schmidt, Meta 1 Coin Trust, Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner, Alfred Dewitt Warner, Jr and Ironheart Trust
Case Number: 1:2020cv00273
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #80 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The parties shall file an agreed proposed scheduling order on or before August 6, 2020. The parties shall attempt to confer in good faith prior to filing the order. See W.D. Tex. Loc. R. CV-16(c). In the event that they are unable to do so, and/or unable to come to an agreement, the parties should explain that in their agreed proposed scheduling order. See id. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
July 7, 2020 Filing 80 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Order by Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun. (Hoggan, Jason)
June 23, 2020 Filing 79 Second Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
June 18, 2020 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Status Conference held on 6/18/2020. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(lt)
June 16, 2020 Filing 77 STATUS REPORT Regarding Warner Relief Defendants by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Reece, Jennifer)
June 15, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE by Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner, Alfred Dewitt Warner, Jr (lt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE by Robert P. Dunlap (lt)
June 15, 2020 Filing 74 Joint STATUS REPORT as required by the Court's Order dated June 2, 2020 by Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun. (Mateja, William) Modified on 6/15/2020 (lt).
June 4, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE by Robert P. Dunlap (lt)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that Traversie-Warner, Warner, and Ironheart shall file status reports, separately or jointly, confirming their compliance, or progress towards compliance, with the Court's orders to which they are subject by June 16, 2020. Failure to do so may ultimately result in an order to show cause, a finding of civil contempt, and/or the imposition of sanctions. FURTHER ORDER that the SEC may file a status report on the same topic. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER that the SEC, Pramana, and Shamoun shall file a joint status report confirming Shamoun's compliance, or progress towards compliance, with the Court's orders to which he is subject by June 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
May 29, 2020 Filing 68 WARRANT returned Executed as to David A. Schmidt (transfer documents from Southern District of Florida, Case No. 9:20-mj-08196-WM). (lt)
May 26, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE by Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner (lt)
May 26, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE by Alfred Dewitt Warner, Jr (lt)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #62 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Having considered the factors for sealing judicial records that the Fifth Circuit has delineated, see Bradley ex rel. AJW v. Ackal, 954 F.3d 216, 224-25 (5th Cir. 2020), and noting that no other party has filed a response opposing the motion, the Court will GRANT the motion. The Clerk shall FILE the redacted amended complaint, (Dkt. 62-1), as a separate, unsealed docket entry. The Clerk shall SEAL the unredacted amended complaint, (Dkt. 50). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
May 18, 2020 Filing 62 Joint Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Version of Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion to Redact Amended Complaint) (Mateja, William)
May 18, 2020 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Ironheart Trust served on 5/16/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Reece, Jennifer)
May 18, 2020 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Alfred Dewitt Warner, Jr served on 5/16/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Reece, Jennifer)
May 18, 2020 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner served on 5/15/2020, answer due 6/5/2020. (Reece, Jennifer)
May 14, 2020 Filing 63 AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDACTED) against All Defendants, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(lt)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Freezing Assets and Granting Other Emergency Relief as to Relief Defendants Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner, Alfred Dewitt Warner Jr. and Ironheart Trust. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
May 14, 2020 Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner, Alfred Dewitt Warner, Jr., and Ironheart Trust. (lt)
May 14, 2020 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Meta 1 Coin Trust, Robert P. Dunlap, Nicole Bowdler, David A. Schmidt, Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun, Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner, Alfred Dewitt Warner, Jr, Ironheart Trust, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Request for Issuance of Summons)(lt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE Plaintiff's Proof of Service on Defendants of Order and Other Documents [Docs. 38, 43, 46, 48] by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Tina Justice)(Reece, Jennifer)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING SEC's #38 Motion to amend civil contempt conditions. ORDERS as to Dunlap, Schmidt, and Bowdler. Order that the SEC shall SERVE Defendants with this Order and its Motion by May 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
May 4, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Filing Process Receipt Returned Unexecuted by US Marshals Service, as to Nicole Bowdler. (lt)
May 4, 2020 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENT to #38 MOTION to supplement re #32 MOTION for Contempt Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held In Comtempt Plaintiff's Supplement of Additional Evidence in Support of Supplemental Motion for Contempt [Doc 38] by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: May 3 Newsletter, #2 Exhibit B: Meta1 YouTube Video List)(Reece, Jennifer)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #45 Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Relief Defendants may provide the accountings required by the Court's March 16, 2020, Order, (Dkt. 8), as modified by the Court's April 8, 2020, Order, (Dkt. 26), on or before May 14, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
April 30, 2020 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to Extend the Time for Relief Defendants to Provide Accountings by Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateja, William)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that by May 13, 2020, the United States Marshals are directed to personally SERVE Nicole Bowdler with copies of certain documents filed in this case and this order. FURTHER ORDER that within 14 days of personal service by the Marshals, Bowdler shall provide proof, in writing, that she has complied with the Court's orders. If Bowdler fails to provide this proof, the Court may find her in civil contempt and impose an appropriate sanction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 28, 2020 Filing 43 SUPPLEMENT re #38 MOTION to Amend Contempt Conditions re #32 MOTION for Contempt Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held In Comtempt Plaintiff's Additional Evidence in Support of Supplemental Motion for Contempt [Doc. 38] by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Newsletter)(Reece, Jennifer) Modified on 5/5/2020 (lt).
April 24, 2020 Filing 42 Correspondence Order 4/21/20 Response from David A. Schmidt. (lt) Modified on 4/24/2020 (lt).
April 21, 2020 Filing 41 Warrant Issued as to David A. Schmidt (lt)
April 21, 2020 Filing 40 Warrant Issued as to Robert P. Dunlap (lt)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF CIVIL CONTEMPT and for issuance of BENCH WARRANTS as to Dunlap and Schmidt. ORDER that Bowdler shall provide proof, in writing, that she has complied with the Court's orders, (see Dkt. #8 at 4-7, 12-16; Dkt. #31 at 4-7, 11-13), by April 24, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. CDT. ORDER that the Meta 1 Defendants may respond to the SEC's motion to supplement its motion for an order to show cause, (Dkt. #38 ), on or before April 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 20, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Amend Civil Contempt Conditions re #32 MOTION for Contempt Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held In Contempt by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Jennifer D. Reece, #2 Proposed Order)(Reece, Jennifer) Modified on 5/5/2020 (lt).
April 20, 2020 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/20/2020. Written Order to follow. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(lt)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that the Clerk shall SEAL Dunlap's April 20, 2020, filing #35 Response to Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 20, 2020 Filing 35 RESPONSE to #33 Order by Robert P. Dunlap. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(lt)
April 17, 2020 Filing 34 Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING the SEC's #32 Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held In Contempt. ORDER that all parties shall appear for a hearing by videoconference, personally or through counsel, on Monday, April 20, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. CDT. At the hearing, Defendants Meta 1 Coin Trust, Robert P. Dunlap, individually and d/b/a Clear International Trust, Nicole Bowdler, and David A. Schmidt must show cause for why they should not be held in civil contempt, and have appropriate sanctions imposed against them, for their noncompliance with the Court's Orders. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 15, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Contempt Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Held In Contempt by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Email Exchange w/ attachments, #2 Exhibit B: Transcript of radio program, #3 Exhibit C: selected pages of the Whitepaper, #4 Proposed Order)(Reece, Jennifer)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Orders: (1) Freezing Assets; (2) Prohibiting the Destruction of Documents; and (3) Requiring Accountings as to Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 13, 2020 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 4/13/2020 re MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(lt)
April 10, 2020 Filing 29 WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Reece, Jennifer)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that the Clerk shall SEAL #27 Correspondence filed by Robert P. Dunlap. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 9, 2020 Filing 27 Correspondence with "Judicial Notice" from Robert P. Dunlap. (lt)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 Unopposed Motion of Relief Defendants Pramana Capital, Inc. and Peter K. Shamoun a/k/a Peter K. Shamoon. ORDER MODIFYING Asset Freeze Order and Other Orders. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 6, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Asset Freeze Order and Order Requiring Accounting as to Relief Defendants by Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mateja, William) Modified on 4/6/2020 (lt).
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Orders: (1) Freezing Assets; (2) Prohibiting the Destruction of Documents; and (3) Requiring Accounts as to All Defendants by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order)(Reece, Jennifer)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Jason Christopher Hoggan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Pramana Capital, Inc. and Peter K. Shamoun. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 2, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt #0542-13413395 by William B. Mateja Jason Hoggan by on behalf of Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun. (Mateja, William)
April 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Status by Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun (Mateja, William)
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William B. Mateja on behalf of Pramana Capital, Inc., Peter K. Shamoun. Attorney William B. Mateja added to party Pramana Capital, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William B. Mateja added to party Peter K. Shamoun(pty:dft) (Mateja, William)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission's motion to authorize substitute service of process. FURTHER ORDER that by emailing and sending the filings via UPS to Meta 1, Dunlap, and Bowdler, the SEC shall be considered to have properly effected service of March 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 18 Letter/Correspondence from Robert Paul Dunlap, Trustee Meta 1 Coin Trust. (lt)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Order: (1) Authorizing Substituted Service of Process on Defendants Meta 1 Coin Trust, Robert P. Dunlap, Individually and d/b/a Clear International Trust, and Nicole Bowdler and (2) Finding that Service has Been Effected by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Jennifer D. Reece, #2 Proposed Order)(Reece, Jennifer)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Copy of Temporary Restraining Order Dkt. No. #8 marked "Account Closed" received from BBVA, Birmingham, AL. (lt)
March 25, 2020 Filing 15 Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic (tada)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. David A. Schmidt served on 3/20/2020, answer due 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Schmidt)(Reece, Jennifer)
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Pramana Capital, Inc.. Waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Peter K. Shamoun. Waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Reece, Jennifer)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding hearing and associated deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING Hearing on Preliminary Injunction: Hearing set for 4/13/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Judge Robert Pitman. ORDER EXTENDING the temporary restraining order in this case to Wednesday, April 13, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER UNSEALING all sealed filings in this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Status by Securities and Exchange Commission (lt)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Sealed TRO and Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Sealed Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Certification to #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (dl)
March 16, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
March 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nicole Bowdler, Robert P. Dunlap, Meta 1 Coin Trust, Pramana Capital, Inc., David A. Schmidt, Peter K. Shamoun. (dl)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties by Securities and Exchange Commission. (dl)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Appendix Part 1, #3 Appendix Part 2, #4 Certification, #5 Proposed Order)(dl). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 3/20/2020 (lt).
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Case by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(dl)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Meta 1 Coin Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter K. Shamoun
Represented By: Jason C. Hoggan
Represented By: William B. Mateja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pramana Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Jason C. Hoggan
Represented By: William B. Mateja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter K. Shamoon
Represented By: Jason C. Hoggan
Represented By: William B. Mateja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Bowdler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert P. Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meta 1 Coin Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Ironheart Traversie-Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Dewitt Warner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironheart Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: James E. Etri
Represented By: Jennifer D. Reece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?