West Elgin Development Corporation v. The Hanover Insurance Company
Plaintiff: West Elgin Development Corporation
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00331
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Agreed MOTION to Abate. This case is abated for a period of sixty (60) days from the date of this Order or until notice from both Parties to the Court of their intent to proceed in litigation. All pending deadlines are hereby STAYED until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
April 20, 2020 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION to Abate by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Emory) Modified on 4/20/2020 to modify event to motion to stay case(jv2).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Tyler M. Frankel as Attorney for Defendant. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by West Elgin Development Corporation. (Kabat, Michael)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Tyler M. Frankel by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allen, Emory) Modified on 4/14/2020 (jv2).
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Allen, Emory)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Allen, Emory)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Tyler M. Frankel to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
March 26, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
March 26, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Hanover Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13393584), filed by The Hanover Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (part 1), #2 Exhibit 1 (part 2), #3 Exhibit 1 (part 3), #4 Exhibit 1 (part 4), #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West Elgin Development Corporation v. The Hanover Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Elgin Development Corporation
Represented By: Ethan Jacob Ranis
Represented By: Michael Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Ward
Represented By: Tyler Frankel
Represented By: Emory Grissom Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?