MacLeod v. EZCorp et al
Plaintiff: William Dale MacLeod
Defendant: EZCorp and Ezmoney Tario Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00334
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 Transfer and Case Opening Letter mailed William Dale MacLeod. (dl)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 Case electronically transferred in from Western District of New York; Case Number 1:20-cv-00238.
March 27, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane.. Referral Judge: Mark Lane. (cj)
March 27, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Dale MacLeod. (cj)
March 27, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
March 27, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that within 30 days of the date of this order Plaintiff must show cause why venue is appropriate in this district. If Plaintiff does not do so, the Clerk of Court shall transfer this case without further order of the Court to the Western District of Texas. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/25/2020. (KM)(Plaintiff mailed a copy of this document.) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Dale MacLeod.(CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EZCorp, Ezmoney Tario Inc., filed by William Dale MacLeod.(CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information, and ADR Notification. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/27/2020.]
February 24, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 3/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacLeod v. EZCorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZCorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ezmoney Tario Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Dale MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?