Diez v. Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Logan Diez
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00495
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Filing 15 Second Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
June 2, 2020 Filing 14 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by James Logan Diez. (dm)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing, Memorandum of Legal Authority by James Logan Diez. (dm)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #5 Report and Recommendations by James Logan Diez. (dm)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 Certified mail acknowledgment receipt for magistrate report and recommendations re #5 Report and Recommendations as to James Logan Diez. (dm)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiff may object to Judge Lane's report and recommendation, (Dkt. 5), by July 1, 2020. His objections must be received by the Clerk within this period. See Hernandez v. Aldridge, 902 F.2d 386, 388 (5th Cir. 1990). However, because Plaintiff is being served by mail, three days will be added to this period under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(d), and the period is further subject to modification under Rule 6(a)(1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Report and Recommendation by James Logan Diez. (dm)
May 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing, Memorandum of Law on Failure to Warn by James Logan Diez. (dm)
May 13, 2020 Filing 8 Letter/Correspondence from James Logan Diez regarding Inmate Balance History Report. (dm)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt of #5 Report and Recommendations. (dm)
May 12, 2020 CASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 Letter/Correspondence addressed to District Attorney Bill Price. (dm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Logan Diez, #3 Motion on Waiver of Account Statement filed by James Logan Diez, GRANTING #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by James Logan Diez. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (dm)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 Courts Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID19 Pandemic(ta)
May 7, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (cj)
May 7, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION on Waiver of Account Statement by James Logan Diez. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (cj)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Logan Diez.. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (cj)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by James Logan Diez. (Attachments: #1 Summary of Claims, #2 Civil Cover Sheet and Envelope)(cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diez v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Logan Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?