Clausen et al v. Woodbolt Distribution, LLC
Plaintiff: Dale Clausen and Timothy Duncan
Defendant: Woodbolt Distribution LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00559
Filed: May 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 47 Case Transfer and Opening Letters mailed to all Counsel. (cj)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Orders Directing Judi Curry, Philip Lawrence Fraietta, Kelly Jones Howell, and Andrew Obergfell to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
May 26, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan, Woodbolt Distribution LLC. (cj)
May 26, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
May 26, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
May 26, 2020 Filing 45 Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of New York; Case Number 1:19-cv-08837.
May 22, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Western District of Texas (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #44 Order,,, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing..(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: WHEREAS, a conference was held on May 14, 2020, regarding Defendant Woodbolt Distribution, LLC's letter requesting to file a motion to transfer under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). ECF 41. It is hereby ORDERED that for the reasons stated at the conference, this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this matter and transfer the case to the Western District of Texas. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/14/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Telephone Conference held on 5/14/2020. (Court Reporter Present) (jcs) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 8, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated May 8, 2020 re: #41 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re Transfer of Venue addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Judi Abbott Curry dated May 1, 2020. . Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan..(Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 42 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #41 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re Transfer of Venue addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Judi Abbott Curry dated May 1, 2020. filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs shall file a response to this letter by May 8, 2020, that complies with the Court's Individual Rules. The parties shall a1end a telephonic conference on May 14, 2020, at 10:30 A.M. to discuss the le1er submissions regarding Plaintiffs' request to file a mo&on to amend and Defendant's request to file a change of venue. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and use the Access Code 558-3333. (Responses due by 5/8/2020, Telephone Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/4/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 41 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re Transfer of Venue addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Judi Abbott Curry dated May 1, 2020. Document filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC..(Curry, Judi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 40 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Judi Abbott Curry dated May 1, 2020 re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion to Amend addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated April 27, 2020. . Document filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC..(Curry, Judi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (13 in 1:20-mc-00186-LGS) Letter filed by General Nutrition Corporation, (38 in 1:19-cv-08837-LGS) Letter filed by GNC Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: The motion to compel filed in 20 Misc. 186 is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to file this endorsement in 20 Misc. 186 and 19 Civ. 8837. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close 20 Misc. 186. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/1/2020) (mml) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 30, 2020 Filing 38 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Rachel Bevans dated April 30, 2020 re: Status of Order by Court. Document filed by GNC Corporation..(Bevans, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 28, 2020 Filing 37 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #36 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion to Amend addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated April 27, 2020. filed by Timothy Duncan, Dale Clausen. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant shall file a response to this letter by May 1, 2020, that complies with the Court's Individual Rules. (Responses due by 5/1/2020) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/28/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Conference Re Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion to Amend addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated April 27, 2020. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan..(Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SECONDED AMENDED CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER:This Civil Case Management Plan is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Settlement discussions have taken place. This case is to be tried to a jury. By April 10, 2020 and May 25, 2020 the parties shall submit a joint status letter, as outlined in Individual Rule IV.A.2. By 7/25/2020 the parties shall submit a joint status letter, as outlined in Individual Rule IV.A.2 and, in the event that they have not already been referred for settlement discussions, shall also advise the Court whether or not they request a referral for settlement discussions as provided in Paragraph 4(c) above. Deposition due by 6/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2020. Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall, by June 2, 2020, file a joint letter with the Court stating how many depositions have been completed and statingand the dates for all remaining depositions. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter the dates under paragraphs 5,6,8(a), 9(b)-(c) and 13(a)-(c) into the Court's calendar. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/27/2020) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (11 in 1:20-mc-00186-LGS) Letter filed by General Nutrition Corporation, (33 in 1:19-cv-08837-LGS) Letter filed by GNC Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: GNC shall, by April 30, 2020, file an affidavit describing the time and expense required to search for and produce nationwide and New York total dollar and unit sales for the years of 2018 and 2019 broken down by the months. A second amended case management plan that extends the discovery deadlines shall issue separately. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. The parties attntion is directed to the new deadline for informing the Court of scheduled depositions. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to docket this endorsement in 19 Civ. 8837 and 20 Misc. 186. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/27/2020) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 22, 2020 Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Rachel Bevans dated April 22, 2020 re: Joint Letter to Court re: Status Update. Document filed by GNC Corporation..(Bevans, Rachel) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs and General Nutrition Corporation shall, no later than April 22, 2020, meet and confer about Plaintiffs' subpoena request. On April 22, 2020, the parties shall file a joint letter in the civil action updating the Court on progress resolving the discovery dispute. The letter shall include the parties' respective positions if any disagreement remains. The letter shall not exceed six pages, single-spaced. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/10/2020) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT. JOINT Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan..(Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FIRST AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. See 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All fact discovery shall be completed no later than 6/23/2020. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by 6/15/2020. If you have identified types of experts in question 9(a), all expert discovery shall be completed no later than 8/8/2020. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is two to three weeks, subject to variations based on whether any class or subclasses are certified. On 8/20/2020 at 10:40 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/20/2020 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/11/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 29 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #28 Letter filed by Timothy Duncan, Dale Clausen. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. An amended case management plan will issue separately. No further extensions absent extraordinary circumstances. (Expert Discovery due by 8/8/2020., Fact Discovery due by 6/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/11/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 28 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated 3/10/20 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan..(Obergfell, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AGREED-TO PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND NON-DISCLOSURE AGREEMENT...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...The Court retains unfettered discretion whether or not to afford confidential treatment to any Confidential Information or information contained therein submitted to the Court in connection with any motion, application, or proceeding that may result in an order and/or discretion by the Court. The parties are reminded to comply with the Court's Individual Rules, including the rules regarding the submission of sealed and redacted materials. Any provisions that are inconsistent with the Court's rules regarding the submission of sealed and redacted materials are hereby stricken. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/4/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 26 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan..(Obergfell, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion for Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED. Parties shall file the modified protective order on the docket by March 3, 2020. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/27/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Conference unopposed request to amend protective order addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated 2/26/20. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan..(Obergfell, Andrew) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED-TO PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY AND NON-DISCLOSURE AGREEMENT...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (As further set forth in this Order.) The Court retains unfettered discretion whether or not to afford confidential treatment to any Confidential Information or information contained therein submitted to the Court in connection with any motion, application, or proceeding that may result in an order and/or discretion by the Court. The parties are reminded to comply with the Court's Individual Rules, including the rules regarding the submission of sealed and redacted materials. Any provisions that are inconsistent with the Court's rules regarding the submission of sealed and redacted materials are hereby stricken. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/10/2020) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan. (Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC.(Curry, Judi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Judi Abbott Curry dated December 20, 2019 re: Defendant Does Not Intend to File a Motion to Dismiss and will File its Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Document filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC.(Curry, Judi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. No additional parties may be joined after January 10, 2020 without leave of Court. Amended pleadings may be filed without leave of Court until January 10, 2020 or as provided for leave as of right under Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than May 10, 2020. Depositions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30, 31 shall be completed by June 15, 2020. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than June 25, 2020. This case is to be tried to a jury. On July 9, 2020 at 10:30 A.M. a pre-motion conference will be held for any anticipated dispositive motions, as further set forth in this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2020. Deposition due by 6/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 5/10/2020. Expert Discovery due by 6/25/2020. Pre-Motion Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/16/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by December 20, 2019, Defendant shall file a letter stating whether it intends to file a motion to dismiss. If yes, the letter shall include a proposed briefing schedule that both parties support. The case management plan and scheduling order will issue in a separate order. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/16/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/12/2019. (Lewis, Barton) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: ORDERED that the initial conference is adjourned to December 12, 2019, at 5:30 P.M., ( Initial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 05:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/10/2019) (ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated December 5, 2019 re: Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan. (Attachments: #1 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan)(Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated December 5, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's November 27, 2019 Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan.(Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/5/2019 (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Letter Motion for Conference; granting in part and denying in part #13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The initial conference set for December 10, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. is adjourned to December 12, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. The parties shall file the pre-initial conference material by December 5, 2019. Plaintiffs shall also file a response to this letter by December 5, 2019. The letter shall comply with the Court's Individual Rules regarding pre-motion letters. The letter shall include a complete briefing schedule. The schedule may take into consideration the December holidays. (Initial Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 12/2/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Judi Abbott Curry dated November 27, 2019., LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference (Initial) addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Judi Abbott Curry dated November 27, 2019. Document filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC.(Curry, Judi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Woodbolt Distribution, LLC.(Curry, Judi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED.The initial conference set for November 21, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. is adjourned to December 10, 2019, at 10:30 A.M. Initial Conference set for 12/10/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/4/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Philip L. Fraietta dated October 10, 2019. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan.(Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Woodbolt Distribution, LLC waiver sent on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. Document filed by Dale Clausen; Timothy Duncan. (Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kelly Jones Howell on behalf of Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Howell, Kelly) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judi Curry on behalf of Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (Curry, Judi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/7/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Woodbolt Distribution, LLC. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Woodbolt Distribution, LLC d/b/a Nutrabolt, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan. (Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand 5,000,001,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to 5,000,000. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the attorney information was omitted from the PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Philip Lawrence Fraietta. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Woodbolt Distribution, LLC d/b/a Nutrabolt, Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party was entered incorrectly. (dnh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Woodbolt Distribution, LLC d/b/a Nutrabolt, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan. (Fraietta, Philip) Modified on 9/24/2019 (dnh). [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Woodbolt Distribution, LLC d/b/a Nutrabolt. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-17649506)Document filed by Dale Clausen, Timothy Duncan.(Fraietta, Philip) [Transferred from New York Southern on 5/26/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clausen et al v. Woodbolt Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Clausen
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Represented By: Andrew Obergfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Duncan
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Represented By: Andrew Obergfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woodbolt Distribution LLC
Represented By: Judi Curry
Represented By: Kelly Jones Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?