Practice Interactive, Inc. v. Candelario et al
Plaintiff: Practice Interactive, Inc.
Defendant: Gregory Candelario and Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00645
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James R Nowlin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Return of Service on Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC by Practice Interactive, Inc. re #12 Clerk's Entry of Default (Mullins, Jordan)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Return of Service on Gregory Caldelario by Practice Interactive, Inc. re #11 Clerk's Entry of Default (Mullins, Jordan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC. (td)
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gregory Candelario. (td)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default against Gregory Candelario and Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC by Practice Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Mullins, Jordan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Practice Interactive, Inc.. Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Mullins, Jordan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Practice Interactive, Inc.. Gregory Candelario served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. (Mullins, Jordan)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Substitute Service. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (dm)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Service by Practice Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Mullins, Jordan)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gregory Candelario, Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC)(dl)
June 19, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Practice Interactive, Inc.. (dl)
June 19, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
June 19, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Practice Interactive, Inc.. Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC (Mullins, Jordan) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/22/2020) (dl). (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/22/2020) (dl).
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Practice Interactive, Inc.. Gregory Candelario (Mullins, Jordan) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/22/2020 to flatten image) (dl).
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Original) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13683347), filed by Practice Interactive, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mullins, Jordan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/22/2020 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Practice Interactive, Inc. v. Candelario et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Candelario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tissue Culture Research and Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Practice Interactive, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Kennedy Mullins
Represented By: Michael Kabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?