Bank of America v. Textbook Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America
Defendant: Brian D. Williams, Kevin S. Tracy and Textbook Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00667
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Textbook Solutions, Inc., Kevin S. Tracy, Brian D. Williams.(Gorthey, Kemp)
July 16, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Textbook Solutions, Inc. answer due 7/27/2020; Kevin S. Tracy answer due 7/27/2020; Brian D. Williams answer due 7/27/2020. (td)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before July 27, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Textbook Solutions, Inc., Kevin S. Tracy, Brian D. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorthey, Kemp)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso on behalf of Bank of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Macaluso, Tricia)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of America. Kevin S. Tracy served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Macaluso, Tricia)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of America. (Macaluso, Tricia)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of America. Textbook Solutions, Inc. served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Macaluso, Tricia)
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of America. Brian D. Williams served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Macaluso, Tricia)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bank of America. Brian D. Williams served on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Macaluso, Tricia)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Kyle S. Hirsch. (dl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Textbook Solutions, Inc., Kevin S. Tracy, Brian D. Williams. (dl)
June 25, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
June 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bank of America. (Macaluso, Tricia)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bank of America. to Textbook Solutions, Inc., Brian D. Williams and Kevin S. Tracy (Macaluso, Tricia)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13700008), filed by Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Macaluso, Tricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America v. Textbook Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America
Represented By: Tricia Wisenbaker Macaluso
Represented By: Kyle S. Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Williams
Represented By: Kendall L. Bryant
Represented By: Kemp W. Gorthey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin S. Tracy
Represented By: Kendall L. Bryant
Represented By: Kemp W. Gorthey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textbook Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Kendall L. Bryant
Represented By: Kemp W. Gorthey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?