Jones v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Jones
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., American Medical Systems Inc and American Medical Systems Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00757
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc., American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Spencer, Lora)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 AMS ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American Medical Systems Holdings Inc., American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc..(Spencer, Lora)
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lora Spencer on behalf of American Medical Systems Holdings Inc., American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Spencer, Lora)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christina M. Vitale on behalf of American Medical Systems Holdings Inc., American Medical Systems Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Vitale, Christina)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tammy Jones as to American Medical Systems Inc. Waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Fredona, Rebecca)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Fredona. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Fredona ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13776541) by on behalf of Tammy Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fredona, Rebecca)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Rebecca Fredona re: non-admitted status. (cj)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13770019). No Summons requested at this time, filed by tammy jones.(Lumber, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/17/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tammy Jones. (cj)
July 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christina M. Vitale
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Christina M. Vitale
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Christina M. Vitale
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Inc
Represented By: Christina M. Vitale
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Christina M. Vitale
Represented By: Lora Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Jones
Represented By: David J. Lumber
Represented By: Rebecca Fredona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?