Austin Cycle Imports, LLC v. Genuine Scooters, LLC
Plaintiff: Austin Cycle Imports, LLC doing business as Urban Motorsports
Defendant: Genuine Scooters, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00782
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #5 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff's amended complaint, (Dkt. 6), Defendant's motion to dismiss, (Dkt. 5), pertains to a now-superseded pleading and is thus MOOT. See Good River Farms, LP v. TXI Operations, LP, No. 1:17-CV-1117-RP, 2018 WL 1770494, at *3 (W.D. Tex. Apr. 12, 2018); see also King v. Dogan, 31 F.3d 344, 346 (5th Cir. 1994). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Austin Cycle Imports, LLC, re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Genuine Scooters, LLC (Starling, Brandon)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Genuine Scooters, LLC amending, filed by Austin Cycle Imports, LLC.(Starling, Brandon)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Genuine Scooters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thompson, Karson)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 Amended NOTICE of Removal by Genuine Scooters, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Genuine Scooters, LLC.(Field, Scott)
July 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Genuine Scooters, LLC answer due 8/31/2020. (td)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, (Dkt. 1-1), on or before August 31, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Petition by Genuine Scooters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Field, Scott)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 24, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
July 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Genuine Scooters, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13792973), filed by Genuine Scooters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement to JS44)(Field, Scott) (Attachment 3 replaced and flattened on 7/24/2020) (cj). (Attachment 4 replaced and flattened on 7/24/2020) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin Cycle Imports, LLC v. Genuine Scooters, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Cycle Imports, LLC doing business as Urban Motorsports
Represented By: Brandon Lee Starling
Represented By: Susan G. White
Represented By: Timothy D. Zeiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Scooters, LLC
Represented By: Scott King Field
Represented By: Karson Karl Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?