Homeland Insurance Company of New York v. Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc., Sonic Healthcare (Ireland), Limited, MedLab Pathology, Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc. and Sonic Healthcare, Limited
Case Number: 1:2020cv00783
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, (Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant and Counterclaimant Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc.s Counterclaims) by Homeland Insurance Company of New York.(Fasone, Jenna)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #19 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff's amended complaint, (Dkt. 21), Defendant's motion to dismiss, (Dkt. 19), pertains to a now-superseded pleading and is thus MOOT. See Good River Farms, LP v. TXI Operations, LP, No. 1:17-CV-1117-RP, 2018 WL 1770494, at *3 (W.D. Tex. Apr. 12, 2018); see also King v. Dogan, 31 F.3d 344, 346 (5th Cir. 1994). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2)
October 12, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York, re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc., Defendant Sonic Healthcare, Limited, Defendant MedLab Pathology, Defendant Sonic Healthcare (Ireland), Limited (Fasone, Jenna)
October 12, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment, Negligent Misrepresentation, Breach of Warranty, and Reformation against All Defendants amending #1 COMPLAINT, filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Warranty Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - Primary Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Excess Policy)(Fasone, Jenna) Modified on 10/13/2020 (jv2).
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #17 Gregory E. Van Houten's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants and Cross-Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by MedLab Pathology, Sonic Healthcare (Ireland), Limited, Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc., Sonic Healthcare, Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of R. Moore, #2 Exhibit Declaration of T. Seeto, #3 Exhibit Declaration of J. West)(Martin, Ernest)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Homeland Insurance Company of New York by Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Homeland Primary Policy, #2 Exhibit Homeland Excess Policy)(Martin, Ernest)
September 24, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ernest Martin, Jr For Gregory E. Van Houten ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14002464) by on behalf of Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc.(Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Martin, Ernest) (Main Document 17 and Attachment 1 replaced on 9/24/2020 to flatten images) (jv2). Modified on 9/24/2020 (jv2).
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernest Martin, Jr on behalf of Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc. (Martin, Ernest)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ernest Martin, Jr on behalf of Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc.. Attorney Ernest Martin, Jr added to party Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc.(pty:dft) (Martin, Ernest)
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York as to Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Fasone, Jenna)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York as to Sonic Healthcare, Limited. Waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Fasone, Jenna)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York as to Sonic Healthcare (Ireland), Limited. Waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Fasone, Jenna)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York as to MedLab Pathology. Waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Fasone, Jenna)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York as to Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Fasone, Jenna)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Fasone, Jenna)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Jenna Fasone to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Homeland Insurance Company of New York. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for John T. Brooks to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Homeland Insurance Company of New York. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc., MedLab Pathology, Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc., Sonic Healthcare (Ireland), Limited, Sonic Healthcare, Limited. (lt)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summonses)(Little, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
July 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Little re Jenna A. Fasone ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13795007) by on behalf of Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Little, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Little re John T. Brooks ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13794972) by on behalf of Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Little, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Little, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13794753). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Homeland Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Little, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Homeland Insurance Company of New York v. Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Healthcare USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Healthcare (Ireland), Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedLab Pathology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinical Pathology Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonic Healthcare, Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Homeland Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Joseph R. Little
Represented By: Jenna A. Fasone
Represented By: John T. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?