Ilios Production Design, LLC v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ilios Production Design, LLC
Defendant: The Cincinnati Casualty Company, Inc., The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Inc. and The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00857
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Ilios Production Design, LLC, re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Cincinnati Casualty Company, Inc., Defendant The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(td)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Ilios Production Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Motion to Exceed Page Limits, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Response to Defendants 12b6 Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiffs Response to Motion to Dismiss)(Gordon, Roger)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants; by Ilios Production Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension to File Response)(Gordon, Roger)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Reconsideration, , Motion Extension of Time to File Response filed by Ilios Production Design, LLC. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Reconsideration , Extension of Time and Proposed Order by Ilios Production Design, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 6b Motion for Extension of Time, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Reconsideration and Extension of Time)(Gordon, Roger)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 VACATED PER ORDER #7 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td) Modified on 9/17/2020 (td).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
August 28, 2020 Notice of Correction: re #4 Conditional Transfer Order. ***PLEASE DISREGARD: Order filed in error. Case will be reopened. (dm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc., The Cincinnati Casualty Company, Inc., The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Proposed Order)(Walker, Matthew) Modified on 9/15/2020 to add filers (td).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13867208), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/17/2020: #5 Supplement to the Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ilios Production Design, LLC v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilios Production Design, LLC
Represented By: Roger E. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Casualty Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Indemnity Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew D. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?