Steiner Steakhouse, LLC v. AMCO Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Steiner Steakhouse, LLC doing business as Steiner Ranch Steakhouse
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00858
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 5, 2020 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by AMCO Insurance Company, re #22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant AMCO Insurance Company, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AMCO Insurance Company (Kemp, Patrick)
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion by Meka Moore to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick M. Kemp for Meka Moore ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14026147) by on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC, re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant AMCO Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(td)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(td)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Leave to File Late Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING #11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 28, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike Dkt. 11 by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loyd, Shannon)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Shannon E. Loyd: re #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation re Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (td)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Proposed Order)(Loyd, Shannon)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 ***DEFICIENT PLEADING - filed in wrong case***Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation re Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Resp to Def's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Loyd, Shannon) Modified on 9/28/2020 (td).
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #7 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Loyd, Shannon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AMCO Insurance Company amending, filed by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Loyd, Shannon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court File)(Kemp, Patrick)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Petition for Failure to State a Claim by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Kemp, Patrick)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ethan D. Carlyle on behalf of AMCO Insurance Company. Attorney Ethan D. Carlyle added to party AMCO Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Carlyle, Ethan)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 17, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steiner Steakhouse, LLC. (dl)
August 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
August 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMCO Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13869384), filed by AMCO Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supp Civil Cover, #4 Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Kemp, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steiner Steakhouse, LLC v. AMCO Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMCO Insurance Company
Represented By: Patrick M. Kemp
Represented By: Robert Glen Wall
Represented By: Ethan D. Carlyle
Represented By: Meka Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steiner Steakhouse, LLC doing business as Steiner Ranch Steakhouse
Represented By: Shannon E. Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?