Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Seibert
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: David Seibert doing business as Sei-Equity Investments also known as Sei Equity Investments also known as Seibert Equity Investments doing business as Great America Funding, LLC also known as Great American Funding, L.L.C. also known as Great America, Great American Funding Lender Services, Sei Equity Investments, Seibert Equity Investments and Great American Funding, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00935
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission as to David Seibert. Waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Padove, Susan)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 ATTACHMENT (Amended Proposed Consent Order) to #4 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Padove, Susan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Padove, Susan)
September 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David Seibert. (cj)
September 10, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
September 10, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 10, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Seibert, David) (Padove, Susan) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 9/10/2020) (cj).
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Padove, Susan) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 9/10/2020) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Seibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Seibert doing business as Sei-Equity Investments also known as Sei Equity Investments also known as Seibert Equity Investments doing business as Great America Funding, LLC also known as Great American Funding, L.L.C. also known as Great America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Funding Lender Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sei Equity Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seibert Equity Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Funding, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Susan B. Padove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?