Phillips v. Weatherford US, LP
Plaintiff: Joseph Phillips
Defendant: Weatherford US, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01104
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:623
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Weatherford US, LP answer due 1/6/2021. (cj)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint,(Dkt. 1), on or before January 6, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Weatherford US, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linzy, Rachel)
December 1, 2020 Weatherford US, LP answer due 12/16/2020. (cj)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint, (Dkt. 1), on or before December 16, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Weatherford US, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Linzy, Rachel)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Weatherford US, LP. (cj)
November 6, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joseph Phillips. (cj)
November 6, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
November 6, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joseph Phillips. (Sibley, Joe) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 11/6/2020) (cj).
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14157708), filed by Joseph Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(Sibley, Joe) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 11/6/2020) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Weatherford US, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Phillips
Represented By: Joe Sibley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weatherford US, LP
Represented By: Rachel E. Linzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?