Ney v. 3i Group plc et al
Plaintiff: S. Chris Ney and S. Christopher Ney
Defendant: 3i Group PLC and 3i Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv01142
Filed: November 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by 3i Corporation, 3i Group PLC, re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(3) filed by Defendant 3i Corporation, Defendant 3i Group PLC (Terrazas, Kevin)
December 28, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support, filed by S. Christopher Ney, re #10 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Opposed Motion for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Plaintiff S. Christopher Ney (Dashiell, Amy)
December 18, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by S. Christopher Ney, re #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(3) filed by Defendant 3i Corporation, Defendant 3i Group PLC (Gasink, John)
December 18, 2020 Filing 14 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by 3i Corporation, 3i Group PLC, re #10 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Opposed Motion for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Plaintiff S. Christopher Ney (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Proposed Order)(Terrazas, Kevin)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Support, filed by S. Christopher Ney, re #9 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(3) filed by Plaintiff S. Christopher Ney Reply in Support of Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Gasink, John)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (dm)
December 15, 2020 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by 3i Corporation, 3i Group PLC, re #9 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(3) filed by Plaintiff S. Christopher Ney (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrazas, Kevin)
December 11, 2020 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION for Discovery Opposed Motion for Limited Jurisdictional Discovery by S. Christopher Ney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Gasink, John)
December 11, 2020 Filing 9 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2) MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(3) by S. Christopher Ney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gasink, John)
December 4, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document Exhibit 1-Sealed, #3 Sealed Document Exhibit 2-Sealed, #4 Sealed Document Exhibit 3-Sealed, #5 Sealed Document Exhibit 4-Sealed, #6 Sealed Document Exhibit 5-Sealed, #7 Sealed Document Exhibit 6-Sealed, #8 Sealed Document Exhibit 7-Sealed, #9 Sealed Document Exhibit 8-Sealed) (Terrazas, Kevin)
December 4, 2020 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Under 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Under 12(b)(2), MOTION to Dismiss Under 12(b)(3) by 3i Corporation, 3i Group PLC. (Terrazas, Kevin)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #4 Katie R. Lencioni's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for and on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Marth L. Roth's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for and on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin James Terrazas Katie Lencioni ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14197549) by on behalf of 3i Corporation, 3i Group PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrazas, Kevin)
November 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kevin James Terrazas Martin Roth ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14197527) by on behalf of 3i Corporation, 3i Group PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Terrazas, Kevin)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing the removing party to supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
November 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3i Group plc, 3i corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-14195847), filed by 3i Group plc, 3i corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement)(Terrazas, Kevin) (Attachments 2 and 3 replaced on 11/18/2020 to flatten images) (dl).
November 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
November 18, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by S. Chris Ney. (dl)
November 18, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ney v. 3i Group plc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3i Group PLC
Represented By: Kevin James Terrazas
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Katie R. Lencioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3i Corporation
Represented By: Kevin James Terrazas
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Katie R. Lencioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Chris Ney
Represented By: John Winslow Gasink
Represented By: Amy Lee Dashiell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Christopher Ney
Represented By: John Winslow Gasink
Represented By: Amy Lee Dashiell
Represented By: Lauren Christine Ditty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?