Bernstein v. Snyder et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Bernstein
Defendant: Jeffrey Snyder, Jeff's Resurrections LLC and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 1:2020cv01186
Filed: December 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2021 Filing 37 NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Richards, Clark)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 4/4/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/29/2021, ADR Report Deadline due by 9/24/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 7/16/2021, Discovery due by 10/29/2021, Joinder of Parties due by 7/16/2021, Motions due by 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
January 6, 2021 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/6/2021. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(cc3)
January 6, 2021 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richards, Clark)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Lloyd Rabb. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
December 18, 2020 Filing 29 Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Richards, Clark)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Lloyd L. Rabb, III for Ronald Bernstein. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
December 17, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Plaintiff by Ronald Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Ronald)
December 17, 2020 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald W. Armstrong, II on behalf of Lloyd Rabb ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14298681) by on behalf of Ronald Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Armstrong, Ronald)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Daniel R. Richards and Clark Richards for Jeff's Resurrections LLC and Jeffrey Snyder. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald W. Armstrong, II on behalf of Ronald Bernstein. Attorney Ronald W. Armstrong, II added to party Ronald Bernstein(pty:pla) (Armstrong, Ronald)
December 16, 2020 Filing 23 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Clark Willis Richards added to party Jeff's Resurrections LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clark Willis Richards added to party Jeffrey Snyder(pty:dft) by Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder.(Richards, Clark)
December 16, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richards, Clark)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/21/2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
December 3, 2020 Filing 20 Case Transfer and Opening Letters mailed to all Counsel. (cj)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Orders Directing Scott M. Baker, Jonathan Marc Saffer, and Robert Mark Warzel to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
December 3, 2020 Filing 18 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 4:19-cv-00450.
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendants' #13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 12/2/2020. (ARC) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
December 3, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
December 3, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
December 1, 2020 ***Deadlines terminated. (SSG) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
December 1, 2020 Remark (CD) 12/1/2020: MTD fld 7/28/20. Resp fld 8/7/20. Reply fld 8/14/20. fb 8/14/20. (SSG) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Judge John C Hinderaker added. Judge James A Soto no longer assigned to case. (ADI-SSG, ) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
November 5, 2020 Due to the appointment of a new District Judge in the Tucson Division, this case is hereby reassigned by the Clerk to the Honorable District Judge John C Hinderaker. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CV 19-450-JCH. [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Warzel, Robert) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
August 13, 2020 ***Cleared ATTYADD Flag. (MFR) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Mark Warzel on behalf of Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Warzel, Robert) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
August 7, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ronald Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Baker, Scott)[Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Saffer, Jonathan) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by Ronald Bernstein. (Baker, Scott) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Continue on Inactive Calendar. It is hereby ordered that this cause of action is placed on the inactive calendar for 90 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff shall file a status report within 120 days of this Order informing the Court what, if any, action is needed from the Court. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 3/3/2020. (ARC) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 *MOTION to Continue on Inactive Calendar by Ronald Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Scott) *Modified to remove Ex Parte designation on 2/27/2020 (ARC). [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Ronald Bernstein: Affidavit of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Jeff Snyder and Jeff's Resurrections on 11/29/2019. (Baker, Scott) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Extend Deadline to Serve Summons. It is ordered that the time to serve the summons shall be extended to February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/4/2019. (BAR) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Service by Ronald Bernstein. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Scott) Modified on 12/3/2019, to remove ex part language (BAR). [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INFORMATIONAL ORDER re Communication with the Court, Dispositive Motions, Proposed Orders, Paper Copies, Exhibits, Authority Binders and Emailing Documents. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 10/4/2019. (BAR) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jeff's Resurrections LLC, Jeffrey Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17378266. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-450-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Ronald Bernstein. (Baker, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17378266 filed by Ronald Bernstein. (Baker, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Application for Writ of Replevin)(MCO) [Transferred from Arizona on 12/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernstein v. Snyder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Snyder
Represented By: Robert Mark Warzel
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Clark Willis Richards
Represented By: Daniel R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff's Resurrections LLC
Represented By: Robert Mark Warzel
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Saffer
Represented By: Clark Willis Richards
Represented By: Daniel R. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Bernstein
Represented By: Scott M Baker
Represented By: Ronald W. Armstrong, II
Represented By: Lloyd L. Rabb, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?