United States of America v. $6,091.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $6,091.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2020cv01235
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Declaration of Publication beginning January 8, 2021, and ending February 6, 2021, by United States Of America (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Almonte, Robert)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Warrant for Arrest of Property Issued for $6,091.00, more or less, in United States Currency. (dm)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
December 21, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
December 21, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
December 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE Verified Complaint for Forfeiture, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Agents Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture, #4 Warrant for the Arrest of Property, #5 Proposed Order for Warrant of Arrest of Property)(Almonte, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced and flattened on 12/22/2020) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $6,091.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,091.00, More or Less, in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Robert Almonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?