Ancora Technologies, Inc. v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ancora Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc., LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc., Samsung Electronics America Inc and Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
In Re: Subpoena to CDNetworks, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020mc01045
Filed: October 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Davida P. Brook and Meng Xi. (dl)
October 15, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
October 15, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
October 15, 2020 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from Central District of California; Case Number 2:20-mc-00124.
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO TRANSFER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Transfer Plaintiff's Subpoenas to CDNetworks, Inc. to the Issuing Court #1 . The Clerk of Court is directed to take all necessary steps to facilitate the transfer of this action. Further, the hearing set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM is hereby VACATED. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc., re MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case, #1 served on 9/23/2020. (Brook, Davida) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc., designating Davida P. Brook as local counsel #8 , #10 . (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 9/30/2019, Receipt No. ACACDC-28319904) filed by plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brook, Davida) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28319904) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): MD missing. (Thrasher, Lupe) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Seigel to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28319904) filed by plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brook, Davida) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (pg) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Ancora Technologies, Inc., (Brook, Davida) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case, #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING on Ex Parte Application for Order to Enforce Subpoena Against CDNetworks, Inc. or, in the Alternative, to Transfer by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the MISC - Other Miscellaneous Case, #1 is set for hearing. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven M Seigel on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.]
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO ENFORCE SUBPOENA AGAINST CDNETWORKS, INC. OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO TRANSFER with filing fee previously paid ($47 paid on 9/23/2020, receipt number ACACDC-28204844), filed by Movant Ancora Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Seigel, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Davida P Brook added to party Ancora Technologies, Inc.(pty:mov))(Brook, Davida) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2020.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/15/2020: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ancora Technologies, Inc. v. LG Electronics Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ancora Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Davida P Brook
Represented By: Meng Xi
Represented By: Steven M. Seigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Subpoena to CDNetworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?