Bremer v. SolarWinds Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Bremer
Defendant: J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation and Kevin B. Thompson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re Joint #13 Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Response to Plaintiffs' Complaints. The Court will construe the parties' stipulation as a joint motion, and it will GRANT that motion. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
February 16, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints and Subsequent Amendment by J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
February 10, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Srimath Saliya Subasinghe on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Srimath Saliya Subasinghe added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Srimath Saliya Subasinghe added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Srimath Saliya Subasinghe added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (Subasinghe, Srimath)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica England on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Jessica England added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica England added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica England added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (England, Jessica)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Biles on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Michael J. Biles added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Biles added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Biles added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (Biles, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. (Bessette, Paul)
February 10, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul R. Bessette on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Paul R. Bessette added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Paul R. Bessette added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul R. Bessette added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (Bessette, Paul)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Laurence M. Rosen. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Phillip Kim. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Kirstine Rogers (submitted for Laurence M. Rosen) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14436960) by on behalf of Timothy Bremer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, L.)
February 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by L. Kirstine Rogers (submitted for Phillip Kim) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14436919) by on behalf of Timothy Bremer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rogers, L.)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Bremer. SolarWinds Corporation served on 1/26/2021, answer due 2/16/2021. (Rogers, L.)
January 4, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Stuart L. Cochran, Barden M. Wayne, Phillip Kim and Laurence M. Rosen. (Attachments: #1 PHV Letter for Laurence M. Rosen)(dl)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. (dl)
January 4, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Timothy Bremer. (dl)
January 4, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
January 4, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
January 4, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Timothy Bremer. (Rogers, L.)
January 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14335192), filed by Timothy Bremer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rogers, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bremer v. SolarWinds Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bremer
Represented By: L. Kirstine Rogers
Represented By: Phillip Kim
Represented By: Laurence Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barton Kalsu
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarWinds Corporation
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. Thompson
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?