Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Esther's Tavern, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Esther's Tavern, LLC doing business as The Tavern doing business as Ester's Tavern, Michael Shelton and Shannon Sedwick
Case Number: 1:2021cv00023
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand . Attorney S. Abraham Kuczaj, III added to party Esther's Tavern, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney S. Abraham Kuczaj, III added to party Shannon Sedwick(pty:dft), Attorney S. Abraham Kuczaj, III added to party Michael Shelton(pty:dft) by Esther's Tavern, LLC, Shannon Sedwick, Michael Shelton.(Kuczaj, S.)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Michael Shelton served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (King, Jamie)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Shannon Sedwick served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (King, Jamie)
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Esther's Tavern, LLC served on 1/22/2021, answer due 2/12/2021. (King, Jamie)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (dl)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14351691), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)
January 7, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
January 7, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Esther's Tavern, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esther's Tavern, LLC doing business as The Tavern doing business as Ester's Tavern
Represented By: S. Abraham Kuczaj, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shelton
Represented By: S. Abraham Kuczaj, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Sedwick
Represented By: S. Abraham Kuczaj, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?