Azpurua v. SolarWinds Corporation et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL AZPURUA
Defendant: J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation and Kevin B. Thompson
Petitioner: New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Case Number: 1:2021cv00047
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 All future pleadings should be filed in the lead case, 1:21-cv-00138-RP. PLEASE do not file any further pleadings in this case. (lt)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING NYC Carpenters' #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases. This action is CONSOLIDATED into Cause No. 1:21-cv-138-RP, which will be the lead case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel by New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Gerald T. Drought, #3 Exhibit A - Certification, #4 Exhibit B - NYC Carpenters loss chart, #5 Exhibit C - Bremer loss chart, #6 Exhibit D - Azpurua loss chart, #7 Exhibit E - Notice of Pendency of Bremer, #8 Exhibit F - Notice of Pendency of NYC Carpenters, #9 Exhibit G - BLBG Firm Resume, #10 Proposed Order)(Drought, Gerald)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Joint Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaints and Subsequent Amendment by J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bessette, Paul)
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Srimath Saliya Subasinghe on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Srimath Saliya Subasinghe added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Srimath Saliya Subasinghe added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Srimath Saliya Subasinghe added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (Subasinghe, Srimath)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica England on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Jessica England added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica England added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jessica England added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (England, Jessica)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Biles on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Michael J. Biles added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Biles added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Michael J. Biles added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (Biles, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. (Bessette, Paul)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul R. Bessette on behalf of J. Barton Kalsu, SolarWinds Corporation, Kevin B. Thompson. Attorney Paul R. Bessette added to party J. Barton Kalsu(pty:dft), Attorney Paul R. Bessette added to party SolarWinds Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Paul R. Bessette added to party Kevin B. Thompson(pty:dft) (Bessette, Paul)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Jeremy A. Lieberman, J. Alexander Hood II, Patrick V. Dahlstrom and Peretz Bronstein. (Attachments: #1 PHV Letters)(dl)
January 14, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Daniel Azpurua. (dl)
January 14, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
January 14, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14378528). No Summons requested at this time, filed by DANIEL AZPURUA, J. Barton Kalsu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Briscoe, Willie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azpurua v. SolarWinds Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL AZPURUA
Represented By: Willie C. Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Barton Kalsu
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SolarWinds Corporation
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin B. Thompson
Represented By: Paul R. Bessette
Represented By: Jessica England
Represented By: Srimath Saliya Subasinghe
Represented By: Michael J. Biles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: New York City District Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?