Securities and Exchange Commission v. Stack
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: William Andrew Stack
Case Number: 1:2021cv00051
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to William Andrew Stack. Waiver sent on 1/21/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Enright, John)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Henry Tutor on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney David Henry Tutor added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Tutor, David)
January 25, 2021 Notice of Correction: re #6 Notice of Appearance. Document Not Properly Scanned or Converted to a PDF Document. A correction has been made. Please take note to flatten forms (i.e. save/publish to PDF) before uploading them to CM/ECF, as a failure to do so can result in blank forms being submitted. (jv2)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexander Mircea Vasilescu on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney Alexander Mircea Vasilescu added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Vasilescu, Alexander) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/25/2021) (jv2).
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 Pro Hac Vice Letters sent to David H. Tutor, Alexander M. Vasilescu, and Sanjay Wadhwa re: non-admitted status. (cj)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to William Andrew Stack. (cj)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Enright, John)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John O'Donnell Enright on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. Attorney John O'Donnell Enright added to party Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla) (Enright, John)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(Best, Richard)
January 15, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 15, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Richard R. Best
Represented By: John O'Donnell Enright
Represented By: David Henry Tutor
Represented By: Alexander Mircea Vasilescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Andrew Stack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?