Dunsmore v. McLane
Plaintiff: Richard A. Dunsmore
Defendant: Marsha McLane
Case Number: 1:2021cv00128
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Amend Complaint entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. Plaintiff has until April 10, 2021 to file his amended complaint. Failure to comply may result in dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sf1)
March 16, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Response to the Court's #4 Show Cause Order with Request for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Richard A. Dunsmore.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (lt)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 Presentation of Public Media Article as Exhibit and ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Richard A. Dunsmore. (lt)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Richard A. Dunsmore. ORDER that within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order,Dunsmore must show cause why his complaint should not be dismissed by filing an amended complaint that cures the above noted deficiencies. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Complaint Form)(lt)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sf1)
February 5, 2021 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter mailed to Richard A. Dunsmore. (cj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Richard A. Dunsmore.. Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402 is DUE.), filed by Richard A. Dunsmore. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(cj)
February 5, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin. (cj)
February 5, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunsmore v. McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha McLane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Dunsmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?