Symbology Innovations LLC v. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00159
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Symbology Innovations LLC without Prejudice (Curfman, Andrew)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #11 Stipulation filed by Symbology Innovations LLC, Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC answer due 4/19/2021.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Symbology Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curfman, Andrew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Symbology Innovations LLC. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. (Johnson, Jay)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew S. Curfman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cc3)
February 25, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew S. Curfman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14526836) by on behalf of Symbology Innovations LLC. (Curfman, Andrew) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/26/2021) (cc3).
February 19, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC. (klw)
February 18, 2021 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Symbology Innovations LLC. (Johnson, Jay)
February 18, 2021 Filing 5 Report on Patent sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Andrew S. Curfman re: non-admitted status. (cj)
February 16, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
February 16, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
February 16, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Symbology Innovations LLC. (cj)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Symbology Innovations LLC . (Johnson, Jay)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Johnson, Jay)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Original Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14490384), filed by Symbology Innovations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations LLC v. Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Represented By: Andrew S. Curfman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldwell Banker Real Estate LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?