O'Reilly et al v. CAE Integrated, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Hans Howell, Victor Silva, Alexander Zaiss, James O'Reilly, Joshua Angelchik and Nicholas Novak
Defendant: Ryan F Jacob
Counter Plaintiff: CAE Integrated, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00348
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David A Ezra
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 22 Scheduling Recommendations filed Jointly by CAE Integrated, LLC. (Golden, Michael)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Plaintiff Zaiss Answer to DefendantCAE Integrated, LLCs Counter-Complaint shall be due July 9, 2021. Entered by Judge David A. Ezra. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #20 Counterclaim by Alexander Zaiss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Kerry)
June 11, 2021 Filing 20 COUNTERCLAIM against Alexander Zaiss, filed by CAE Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Golden, Michael)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING without prejudice Counter-Plaintiff's #11 Motion for Entry of Preliminary Injunction and Spoliation Sanctions. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (lt)
June 4, 2021 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David A. Ezra: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2021 re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Spoliation Sanctions filed by CAE Integrated, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Angela Hailey.)(lt)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Order for Scheduling Recommendations and Advisory Concerning Magistrate Judge Assignment. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (jv2)
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #10 Amended Counterclaim FIRST AMENDED by Nicholas Novak.(O'Brien, Kerry)
June 2, 2021 Filing 15 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #9 Amended Counterclaim FIRST AMENDED by James O'Reilly.(O'Brien, Kerry)
June 1, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by CAE Integrated, LLC, re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Spoliation Sanctions filed by Counter Plaintiff CAE Integrated, LLC (Golden, Michael)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Nicholas Novak, re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Spoliation Sanctions filed by Counter Plaintiff CAE Integrated, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(O'Brien, Kerry)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING Motion Hearing via Videoconference for 6/4/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge David A. Ezra. ORDER that Novak must file a response to the motion on or before Thursday, May 27, 2021. Signed by Judge David A. Ezra. (lt)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Spoliation Sanctions by CAE Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order)(Golden, Michael)
May 19, 2021 Filing 10 First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM First against Nicholas Novak amending, filed by CAE Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Golden, Michael)
May 19, 2021 Filing 9 First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM First against James O'Reilly amending, filed by CAE Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Golden, Michael)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 O'REILLY ORIGINAL ANSWER to Complaint & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Attorney Kerry Vincent O'Brien added to party James O'Reilly(pty:cd) by James O'Reilly.(O'Brien, Kerry)
May 6, 2021 Filing 7 COUNTERCLAIM against Nicholas Novak, filed by CAE Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Golden, Michael)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Joshua Angelchik, Hans Howell, Nicholas Novak, James O'Reilly, Victor Silva, Alexander Zaiss of Attorney Vacation Notice. (O'Brien, Kerry)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CAE Integrated, LLC, Ryan F Jacob. (Golden, Michael)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING the case to the docket of the Honorable David Ezra, United States District Judge, for all purposes. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 COUNTERCLAIM against James O'Reilly, filed by CAE Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Golden, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
April 21, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Joshua Angelchik, Hans Howell, Nicholas Novak, James O'Reilly, Victor Silva, Alexander Zaiss. (cj)
April 21, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
April 21, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ryan F Jacob, CAE Integrated, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-14720031), filed by Ryan F Jacob, CAE Integrated, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement)(Golden, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Reilly et al v. CAE Integrated, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: CAE Integrated, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Golden
Represented By: Gilbert O. Nwaopara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hans Howell
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Silva
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Zaiss
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Reilly
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Angelchik
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Novak
Represented By: Kerry Vincent O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan F Jacob
Represented By: Michael J. Golden
Represented By: Gilbert O. Nwaopara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?