Gutierrez et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Roland Gutierrez, Sarah Eckhardt and Tejano Democrats
Defendant: Greg Abbott and Jose A. Esparza
Case Number: 1:2021cv00769
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
2 Judge: Jerry E Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER VACATING the Court's Order, (Dkt. #16 ), setting a non-evidentiary hearing and status conference. The hearing set for October 28, 2021 is cancelled. ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report when they have determined the impact of the litigation in state court on this case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt) Modified on 10/28/2021 (lt).
October 26, 2021 Filing 23 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza (Joint) re Passage of Redistricting Legislation. (Sweeten, Patrick)
October 25, 2021 Filing 22 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez, Tejano Democrats, re #20 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Defendant Greg Abbott (Golando, Martin)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER for plaintiffs to file their response to the Motion to Consolidate no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, October 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
October 20, 2021 Filing 20 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Initial Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
October 8, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Defendant Greg Abbott (jv2)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Defendants' reply in support of their motion to dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
October 6, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Abate Proceedings, #2 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez, Tejano Democrats, re #10 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Golando, Martin) Modified on 10/5/2021 (lt). Modified on 10/5/2021 to correct docket text and docket entry relationship (lt).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING HEARING on #10 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction AND #12 MOTION to Dismiss or Abate set for 10/28/2021 at 10:00 AM before the three-judge panel. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3) Modified on 9/30/2021 (cc3).
September 29, 2021 Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez, Tejano Democrats, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Jose A. Esparza, Defendant Greg Abbott (Golando, Martin)
September 28, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Defendants re #10 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Roland Gutierrez, Plaintiff Tejano Democrats, Plaintiff Sarah Eckhardt. (cc3)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mplc)
September 27, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation as to Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Appendix in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
September 15, 2021 Filing 12 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss or Abate Proceedings by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (lt)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Defendants' motion to dismiss. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
September 14, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Motion to Dismiss by Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez, Tejano Democrats. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Golando, Martin)
September 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Thomas Thompson on behalf of Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Jose A. Esparza(pty:dft) (Thompson, William)
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K. Sweeten on behalf of Greg Abbott, Jose A. Esparza. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Jose A. Esparza(pty:dft) (Sweeten, Patrick)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER appointing three judge panel - Judge Jerry E. Smith and Jeffrey V. Brown signed by Chief Judge Priscilla Richman Owen, for the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. (jg3)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jose A. Esparza. (cc3)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez, Tejano Democrats. (Golando, Martin)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott. (cc3)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Convene a Three Judge Panel by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez, Tejano Democrats. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Golando, Martin)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez, Tejano Democrats. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Golando, Martin)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15176572), filed by Sarah Eckhardt, Roland Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golando, Martin)
September 1, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
September 1, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roland Gutierrez
Represented By: Martin Anthony Golando
Represented By: Wallace Bernard Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Eckhardt
Represented By: Martin Anthony Golando
Represented By: Wallace Bernard Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tejano Democrats
Represented By: Martin Anthony Golando
Represented By: Wallace Bernard Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Esparza
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?