Biancalana v. Lumpkin
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Petitioner: Joseph Biancalana and Joseph Agostino Biancalana, IV
Case Number: 1:2021cv00791
Filed: September 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE. IT IS ORDERED Civil Action No. A-21-CV-792-LY is consolidated with this civil action for all purposes. Civil Action No. A-21-CV-792-LY is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
October 8, 2021 Reset Deadlines: Bobby Lumpkin answer due 11/8/2021. (jv2)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Mark Lane. Respondent's answer is due on or before November 8, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases with Brief in Support by Bobby Lumpkin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Brodbeck, Lori)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with Brief in Support by Bobby Lumpkin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Brodbeck, Lori)
September 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lori Brodbeck on behalf of Bobby Lumpkin. Attorney Lori Brodbeck added to party Bobby Lumpkin(pty:res) (Brodbeck, Lori)
September 15, 2021 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus by Joseph Agostino Biancalana, IV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit)(Jones, Dayna)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Joseph Biancalana and Directing Respondent to Answer. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (jv2)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Joseph Biancalana. (Jones, Dayna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (dl)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0542-15198650), filed by Joseph Biancalana.(Jones, Dayna)
September 8, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
September 8, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biancalana v. Lumpkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Biancalana
Represented By: Dayna L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joseph Agostino Biancalana, IV
Represented By: Dayna L. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?