Wheeler v. Philips North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Wheeler
Defendant: Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC and Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00835
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Case transferred from TXWD has been received and opened in Western District of Pennsylvania as case number 2:21-cv-01446. (dm)
October 20, 2021 Filing 16 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (dm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John M. Deakle. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Russell L. Johnson. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald V. Johnson IV. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 6, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Wheeler. Philips RS North America LLC served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Sharp, Rex)
October 6, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Wheeler. Philips North America LLC served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Sharp, Rex)
October 1, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for John M. Deakle to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100040390) on behalf of William Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(lt)
October 1, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Russell L. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100040390) on behalf of William Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(lt)
October 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Ronald V. Johnson, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100040390) by William Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(lt) Modified on 10/6/2021 to correct docket text (lt).
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Patrick W. Pendley. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (dm)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rex A. Sharp Patrick W. Pendley ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15267277) by on behalf of William Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sharp, Rex)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by William Wheeler. (Sharp, Rex)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Andrea L. Barient, John M. Deakle, Rome V. Johnson, Russell L. Johnson, and Patrick W. Pendley re: non-admitted status. (cj)
September 20, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 20, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (cj)
September 20, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Wheeler. (cj)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by William Wheeler. (Sharp, Rex)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15244650). No Summons requested at this time, filed by William Wheeler.(Sharp, Rex)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Philips North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wheeler
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Represented By: John M. Deakle
Represented By: Patrick W. Pendley
Represented By: Ronald V. Johnson, IV
Represented By: Russell L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Philips N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?